IN HB1081 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Public Law 197
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Local income tax. Updates various laws to conform them to the new local income tax (LIT) law. Adds provisions concerning Lake, LaPorte, and Porter counties concerning the northwest Indiana regional development authority. Addresses the treatment of counties that had only the county economic development income tax regarding the property tax rate for cumulative capital development funds of counties and municipalities. Specifies provisions for the transition of a formerly adopted homestead credit under a county option income tax to a property tax relief rate under the new LIT. Adds provisions concerning expenditure rate allocations. Specifies that the auditor of state is to

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local income tax. Updates various laws to conform them to the new local income tax (LIT) law. Adds provisions concerning Lake, LaPorte, and Porter counties concerning the northwest Indiana regional development authority. Addresses the treatment of counties that had only the county economic development income tax regarding the property tax rate for cumulative capital development funds of counties and municipalities. Specifies provisions for the transition of a formerly adopted homestead credit under a county option income tax to a property tax relief rate under the new LIT. Adds provisions concerning expenditure rate allocations. Specifies that the auditor of state is to

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-09 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-01-14 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-24HousePublic Law 197
2016-03-24HouseSigned by the Governor
2016-03-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2016-03-15HouseSigned by the Speaker
2016-03-11SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2016-03-09HouseDissent withdrawn
2016-03-09HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 409: yeas 99, nays 0
2016-03-08HouseMotion to concur filed
2016-03-02HouseRepresentative Pierce added as advisor
2016-03-02SenateSenate advisors appointed: Miller Pete and Mrvan
2016-03-02SenateSenate conferees appointed: Hershman and Broden
2016-03-02HouseHouse advisors appointed: Ober, Huston, Porter and Stemler
2016-03-02HouseHouse conferees appointed: Thompson and Pryor
2016-03-01HouseMotion to dissent filed
2016-03-01HouseHouse dissented from Senate Amendments
2016-02-26SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2016-02-25SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 221: yeas 41, nays 4
2016-02-23SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2016-02-22SenateSenator Miller, Pete added as second sponsor
2016-02-22SenateAmendment #1 (Hershman) prevailed; voice vote
2016-02-22SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2016-02-18SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2016-02-03SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy
2016-01-26HouseReferred to the Senate
2016-01-25HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Hershman
2016-01-25HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 41: yeas 93, nays 0
2016-01-21HouseAmendment #1 (Thompson) prevailed; voice vote
2016-01-21HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2016-01-19HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2016-01-05HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2016-01-05HouseAuthored by Representative Thompson

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2016/bills/house/1081/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/3/6/8/7368a658/HB1081.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/f/8/c/cf8c63ba/HB1081.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/c/5/b/3c5b1fbf/HB1081.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/7/2/8/1728d855/HB1081.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/5/6/8/b568664f/HB1081.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/8/d/d/98dd9c5e/HB1081.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/e/8/e/9e8efb13/HB1081.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/9/1/2/d9126e81/HB1081.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/0/c/e/20ce3dc9/HB1081.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/7/6/a/976a4d2a/HB1081.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/7/f/6/b7f65a99/HB1081.06.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/1/4/1/4141956e/HB1081.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/7/8/9/a7892fe0/HB1081.41.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/b/8/3/7b8317fb/HB1081.03.ENGH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/4/c/9/94c9acc5/HB1081.221.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/1/4/f/414f7c67/HB1081.409.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback