IN HB1079 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that the governing body of a school corporation may authorize the school corporation to enter into an agreement with an accredited nonpublic school or charter school to allow students of the accredited nonpublic school or charter school to transfer to a school within the school corporation. Provides that a school corporation that has adopted a policy not to accept student transfers after June 30, 2013, is not prohibited from enrolling a member of a household in which any other member of the household was a transfer student who attended a school within the school corporation during the 2012-2013 school year. Provides that in the event a school corporation enrolls a transfer student or a member of the same household of a transfer student that attended a school corporation during the 2012-2013 school year, the school corporation shall also allow a student or member of the same household of a student who attended an accredited nonpublic school within the attendance area of the school corporation during the 2012-2013 school year to enroll in a school within the school corporation.
Title
Student transfers.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Karickhoff [R] | Rep. Edmond Soliday [R] | Rep. Harold Slager [R] | Rep. Linda Lawson [D] |
Sen. Frank Mrvan [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - House - House - Motion to Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Education and Career Development - Roll Call 107902 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - House - (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - House - House Committee on Education - Roll Call 107901 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Education and Career Development - Roll Call 107902 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - House - (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - House - House Committee on Education - Roll Call 107901 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-24 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-24 | House | Public Law 39 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-05 | House | Motion to Concur in Senate Amendments: prevailed; Roll Call 407: yeas 76 and nays 12 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 290: yeas 48 and nays 0 |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senator Mrvan added as cosponsor. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senator Kruse added third sponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Education and Career Development |
2014-01-21 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2014-01-21 | House | Senator Banks added as sponsor. |
2014-01-21 | House | Senator Schneider added as 2nd sponsor. |
2014-01-21 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 34: yeas 97 and nays 0 |
2014-01-16 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-16 | House | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-15 | House | Representative Soliday added as coauthor. |
2014-01-15 | House | Representative Slager added as coauthor. |
2014-01-15 | House | Representative Lawson added as coauthor. |
2014-01-09 | House | First Reading: Referred to Education |
2014-01-09 | House | Authored by Representative Karickhoff. |