IN HB1077 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 101
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Professional licensing agency. Amends various statutes to conform to HEA 1269-2019. Removes the one year limitation on renewing the registration of a pharmacist intern. Provides that the terms for members of the Indiana athletic trainers board are "specified" rather than "made". Removes the requirement that an out-of-state provider's home state extend reciprocity to Indiana licensees when considering the out-of-state provider's application for a license to provide home medical equipment services on the basis of reciprocity. Provides that an out-of-state provider does not need to: (1) have a physical facility; or (2) maintain inventory; in Indiana in order to obtain reciprocity for the purpose of providing home medical equipment services. Reorganizes the home medical equipment services statute by separating the reciprocity requirements from the general license application statute. Updates terminology in the physician assistant statute to refer to collaboration rather than supervision in conformance with HEA 1248-2019. Specifies that a registration concerning the manufacture, distribution, or dispensing of a controlled substance is automatically revoked when: (1) the registration is surrendered for cause; or (2) the Drug Enforcement Administration terminates, denies, or suspends the registration. Makes technical corrections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Professional licensing agency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30HousePublic Law 101
2020-03-18HouseSigned by the Governor
2020-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-12SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2020-03-11HouseSigned by the Speaker
2020-03-10HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 348: yeas 79, nays 0
2020-03-10HouseMotion to concur filed
2020-02-19SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2020-02-18SenateSenator Charbonneau added as second sponsor
2020-02-18SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 208: yeas 48, nays 0
2020-02-17SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2020-02-17SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-02-13SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-02-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2020-01-24HouseReferred to the Senate
2020-01-23HouseRepresentatives Barrett, Fleming, Shackleford added as coauthors
2020-01-23HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Perfect
2020-01-23HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 42: yeas 92, nays 0
2020-01-21HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-16HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2020-01-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2020-01-07HouseAuthored by Representative Zent

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/house/1077/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/8/2/3/882300f2/HB1077.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/e/6/d/5e6df419/HB1077.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/4/5/8/e458c565/HB1077.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/f/8/b/ff8bc589/HB1077.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/4/1/3/b413d00c/HB1077.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/b/f/d/dbfdade9/HB1077.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/0/2/f/c02f4d83/HB1077.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/2/4/b/824b4888/HB1077.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/f/a/d/efad47c9/HB1077.42_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/3/0/3/2303fb1c/HB1077.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/2/2/9/a22932e9/HB1077.208_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/4/0/8/44083d2f/HB1077.348_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback