IN HB1072 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Public Law 15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Personal delivery devices. Provides that a personal delivery device may operate in Indiana under certain circumstances, but may not operate on portions of any state route, U.S. route, or interstate highway comprising the state highway system located in a municipality. Requires a personal delivery device operator to maintain certain levels of insurance coverage. Provides that a personal delivery device is exempt from motor vehicle licensing and registration requirements. Provides that a political subdivision may participate in the regulation of personal delivery devices. Provides that local governments shall not be required to make or pay for infrastructure improvements for the purpose of better accommodating personal delivery devices. Provides that a political subdivision may not enact or enforce an ordinance or resolution relating to: (1) the design, manufacture, maintenance, certification, licensing, registration, taxation, assessment, or insurance of a personal delivery device; or (2) the types of property that may be transported by a personal delivery device.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Personal delivery devices.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-01HousePublic Law 15
2021-04-01HouseSigned by the Governor
2021-03-31SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-03-25SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-03-23HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-03-16SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2021-03-15SenateSenator Walker K added as cosponsor
2021-03-15SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 219: yeas 36, nays 12
2021-03-11SenateSenator Crider added as second sponsor
2021-03-11SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-03-09SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-03-04SenateSenator Ford J.D. added as cosponsor
2021-02-18SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
2021-02-03HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-02-02HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Garten
2021-02-02HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 37: yeas 95, nays 0
2021-02-01HouseRepresentative Johnson added as coauthor
2021-02-01HouseRepresentative Frye added as coauthor
2021-02-01HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-01-28HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-04HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
2021-01-04HouseCoauthored by Representative Pressel
2021-01-04HouseAuthored by Representative Sullivan

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1072/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/4/9/3/44938f08/HB1072.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/b/4/6/cb46f182/HB1072.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/6/7/8/56780eaf/HB1072.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/1/2/1/51215fca/HB1072.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/9/a/d/19ad89b9/HB1072.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/0/9/d/809deb72/HB1072.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/6/4/2/f6426216/HB1072.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/c/1/4/7c148400/HB1072.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/2/9/d/929d0b6f/HB1072.05.ENRS.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/1/1/c/611cd4df/HB1072.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/5/e/a/e5eac9e9/HB1072.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/e/f/3/aef3328f/HB1072.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/6/c/3/b6c380fd/HB1072.02.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/0/b/1/60b17432/HB1072.02.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/3/1/3/f3132f2c/HB1072.03.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/4/e/4/d4e439bd/HB1072.02.COMH.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/d/a/9/4da90709/HB1072.03.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/d/3/3/5d33a88e/HB1072.04.ENGS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/0/4/4/8044b7ca/HB1072.04.ENGS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/2/2/2/e222be71/HB1072.05.ENRS.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/f/2/3/9f2391ef/HB1072.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/9/c/2/d9c2071c/HB1072.37_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/f/5/a/1f5a2c61/HB1072.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/7/e/6/b7e612a0/HB1072.219_S.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback