IN HB1071 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-20 - Senator Becker added as cosponsor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-20 - Senator Becker added as cosponsor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that the maximum state income tax deduction for federal civil service annuity income is equal to the lesser of: (1) the amount of federal civil service annuity income received during the taxable year; or (2) the average annual federal Social Security retirement benefit paid to Indiana retired workers during the calendar year preceding the taxpayer's taxable year. Retains the provision that reduces the deduction by the amount of any federal Social Security and railroad retirement benefits received by the taxpayer during the taxable year. Provides that the deduction is also available to a surviving spouse.
Title
Taxation of civil service annuities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-03 - House - House - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House Floor - (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Roll Call 107101 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House Floor - (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Roll Call 107101 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senator Becker added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senator Skinner added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senator Waltz added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senator Waterman added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Senator Hume added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senator R. Young added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Senator Tomes added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Senator Alting added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Appropriations |
2014-02-03 | House | Senator Grooms added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-03 | House | Senator Landske added third sponsor. |
2014-02-03 | House | Senator Mishler added second sponsor. |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2014-02-03 | House | Senator Steele added as sponsor. |
2014-02-03 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 174: yeas 94 and nays 0 |
2014-01-30 | House | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-28 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-09 | House | First Reading: Referred to Ways and Means |
2014-01-09 | House | Authored by Representative Clere. |
2014-01-09 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Cherry, Koch, Stemler |