IN HB1069 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Public Law 123
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Public Law 123
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Airports. Voids an administrative rule concerning eligibility of projects for which funding is available from the airport development grant fund (grant fund) and relocates (with stylistic changes) the contents of the voided administrative rule. Requires the Indiana department of transportation, in determining the match for a state grant for which federal grants are not available, to: (1) consider the airport classification and the type of project; and (2) require matching funds of at least 25%.
Title
Airports.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Cherry [R] | Rep. Jim Pressel [R] | Rep. Randall Frye [R] | Rep. Mitch Gore [D] |
Sen. Gary Byrne [R] | Sen. James Buck [R] | Sen. Blake Doriot [R] | Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] |
Sen. Eddie Melton [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-18 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | House | Public Law 123 |
2023-05-01 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2023-04-24 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 433: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Senators Charbonneau and Melton added as cosponsors |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Ford J.D.) failed; voice vote |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Senator Doriot added as third sponsor |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Senator Buck added as second sponsor |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-02-23 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation |
2023-01-31 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2023-01-30 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 38: yeas 95, nays 1 |
2023-01-30 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Byrne |
2023-01-26 | House | Representative Gore M added as coauthor |
2023-01-26 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-01-24 | House | Representatives Pressel and Frye added as coauthors |
2023-01-24 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation |
2023-01-09 | House | Authored by Representative Cherry |
Subjects
ADMINISTRATIVE CODE; INDIANA REGISTER
AIRCRAFT AND AIRPORTS
TRANSPORTATION generally
TRANSPORTATION, Department of
AIRCRAFT AND AIRPORTS
TRANSPORTATION generally
TRANSPORTATION, Department of