IN HB1069 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Public Law 130
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Public Law 130
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Immunizations for higher education students. Adds meningitis to the required immunizations a student matriculating to a residential campus of a state educational institution must be immunized against. Specifies that the immunizations must be conducted in accordance with specified federal recommendations. Adds an expiration date to the law requiring a state educational institution to disseminate information concerning the meningococcal disease and immunization and deletes a reference to that requirement. Provides that the new immunization requirements do not take effect until the first academic term following July 1, 2018. Makes conforming and technical changes.
Title
Immunizations for higher education students. Adds meningitis to the required immunizations a student matriculating to a residential campus of a state educational institution must be immunized against. Specifies that the immunizations must be conducted in accordance with specified federal recommendations. Adds an expiration date to the law requiring a state educational institution to disseminate information concerning the meningococcal disease and immunization and deletes a reference to that requirement. Provides that the new immunization requirements do not take effect until the first academic term following July 1, 2018. Makes conforming and technical changes.
Sponsors
Rep. Ronald Bacon [R] | Rep. Sally Siegrist [R] | Rep. Matt Pierce [D] | Rep. Gregory Porter [D] |
Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] | Sen. Vaneta Becker [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Sen. Jean Breaux [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-11 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 33 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House - Amendment #2 (Wesco) prevailed (Y: 68 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 33 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House - Amendment #2 (Wesco) prevailed (Y: 68 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-24 | House | Public Law 130 |
2017-04-24 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-04-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-04-11 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 448: yeas 87, nays 2 |
2017-04-10 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 255: yeas 33, nays 15 |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as cosponsor |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-02-20 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2017-02-01 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2017-01-31 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Charbonneau and Becker |
2017-01-31 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 35: yeas 93, nays 3 |
2017-01-30 | House | Amendment #2 (Wesco) prevailed; Roll Call 25: yeas 68, nays 31 |
2017-01-30 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2017-01-23 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-01-12 | House | Representative Porter added as coauthor |
2017-01-12 | House | Representative Pierce added as coauthor |
2017-01-10 | House | Representative Siegrist S added as coauthor |
2017-01-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2017-01-04 | House | Authored by Representative Bacon |