IN HB1069 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 142
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 142
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Outdoor event equipment.
Title
Outdoor event equipment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-17 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 142 |
2013-05-02 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-04-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-04-17 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 534: yeas 86, nays 0 |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 314: yeas 40, nays 7 |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Amendment 1 (M. Young), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Reread second time: amended and ordered engrossed |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Placed back on second reading |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Reread second time: ordered engrossed |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Third reading: placed back on second reading |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Third reading: call withdrawn |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senators Pat Miller and Wyss added as cosponsors |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2013-02-25 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security, Transportation and Veterans Affairs |
2013-01-23 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Merritt and Lanane |
2013-01-23 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2013-01-23 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 22: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2013-01-22 | House | Amendment 2 (Cherry), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-01-22 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-01-17 | House | Representatives Davis and Austin added as coauthors |
2013-01-15 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-01-14 | House | Representative DeLaney added as coauthor |
2013-01-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety |
2013-01-07 | House | Authored by Representative Cherry |