IN HB1068 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Public Law 196
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Assessment appeals. Provides that, if the county property tax assessment board of appeals (PTABOA) fails to issue a determination concerning a petition to correct errors within 180 days after the petition is filed with the county auditor, the taxpayer may petition the Indiana board of tax review (Indiana board) to correct errors in a final administrative determination. Provides that, if the PTABOA fails to approve or disapprove an exemption application within 180 days after an owner files the exemption application, the owner may petition the Indiana board to approve or disapprove the exemption application. Provides that the Indiana board is

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Assessment appeals. Provides that, if the county property tax assessment board of appeals (PTABOA) fails to issue a determination concerning a petition to correct errors within 180 days after the petition is filed with the county auditor, the taxpayer may petition the Indiana board of tax review (Indiana board) to correct errors in a final administrative determination. Provides that, if the PTABOA fails to approve or disapprove an exemption application within 180 days after an owner files the exemption application, the owner may petition the Indiana board to approve or disapprove the exemption application. Provides that the Indiana board is

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-24HousePublic Law 196
2016-03-24HouseSigned by the Governor
2016-03-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2016-03-01SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2016-02-29HouseSigned by the Speaker
2016-02-24SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2016-02-23SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2016-02-23SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 203: yeas 50, nays 0
2016-02-22SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2016-02-18SenateSenator Yoder added as cosponsor
2016-02-18SenateSenator Zakas added as second sponsor
2016-02-18SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2016-02-08SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
2016-02-03HouseReferred to the Senate
2016-02-02HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Messmer
2016-02-02HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 118: yeas 94, nays 0
2016-02-01HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2016-01-28HouseRepresentatives Truitt, Miller, Porter added as coauthors
2016-01-28HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2016-01-05HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2016-01-05HouseAuthored by Representative Culver

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2016/bills/house/1068/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/2/1/d/c21dd9ce/HB1068.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/d/3/e/6d3e3f08/HB1068.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/b/2/1/3b217128/HB1068.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/0/a/6/40a6a331/HB1068.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/c/8/4/dc84215b/HB1068.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/5/1/6/c5160dd1/HB1068.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/8/1/d/581dfb11/HB1068.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/b/f/2/5bf2be13/HB1068.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/5/4/c/654c870f/HB1068.118.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/7/e/d/07ed526f/HB1068.02.COMH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/a/7/e/3a7ed226/HB1068.203.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback