IN HB1067 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 35
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Dental hygienists. Amends the definition of "prescriptive supervision" concerning circumstances under which a licensed dentist is not required to be present in a facility when patient care is provided by a dental hygienist. Restates restrictions on use of a laser by a dental hygienist. Provides that a dental hygienist may administer topical local dental anesthetics, other than nitrous oxide or similar analgesics, without supervision. Prescribes requirements for administration of nitrous oxide by a dental hygienist or a dental assistant. Provides, for purposes of regulation of dental hygienists, that a person, other than a dentist, a physician, or a dental assistant who administers nitrous oxide is considered to be practicing dental hygiene. Removes a limitation on the number of credit hours earned for certification in basic life support that may be applied to a dental hygienist's continuing education requirement. Provides that there is no limit on the number of credit hours a dental hygienist may earn for completion of an approved course offered by another dental hygienist.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dental hygienists.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-04 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-08 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30HousePublic Law 35
2020-03-14HouseSigned by the Governor
2020-03-11SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-09SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2020-03-05HouseSigned by the Speaker
2020-03-04HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 312: yeas 85, nays 0
2020-03-04HouseMotion to concur filed
2020-02-21SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2020-02-20SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 216: yeas 49, nays 0
2020-02-18SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2020-02-18SenateAmendment #2 (Leising) prevailed; voice vote
2020-02-18SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2020-02-13SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-02-11SenateSenator Grooms added as second sponsor
2020-02-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2020-01-15HouseReferred to the Senate
2020-01-14HouseRepresentatives Fleming and Shackleford added as coauthors
2020-01-14HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Leising
2020-01-14HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 24: yeas 95, nays 0
2020-01-13HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-09HouseRepresentative Clere added as coauthor
2020-01-09HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-06HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2020-01-06HouseAuthored by Representative Zent

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/house/1067/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/d/c/b/bdcbef85/HB1067.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/f/3/2/3f329c76/HB1067.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/4/f/c/c4fcebd6/HB1067.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/0/3/e/503e20d6/HB1067.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/c/8/e/3c8e1347/HB1067.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/3/e/d/13ed98d1/HB1067.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/2/d/6/b2d69506/HB1067.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/5/3/7/45370948/HB1067.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/a/a/b/1aabcb1b/HB1067.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/e/c/2/eec290eb/HB1067.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/d/0/7/8d07f91c/HB1067.24_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/7/d/4/c7d4cf97/HB1067.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/b/e/d/7bed976d/HB1067.216_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/5/7/e/257e0f6c/HB1067.312_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback