IN HB1064 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Indiana career council to complete not later than August 1, 2014, a return on investment and utilization study of career and technical education programs in Indiana. Makes technical corrections.
Title
Study of career and technical education programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-04 - House - House - Motion to Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Education and Career Development - Roll Call 106403 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - House - House Committee on Education - Roll Call 106401 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Education and Career Development - Roll Call 106403 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - House - House Committee on Education - Roll Call 106401 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-24 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-24 | House | Public Law 48 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-05 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2014-03-04 | House | Motion to Concur in Senate Amendments: prevailed, Roll Call 389: yeas 90 and nays 0 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 254: yeas 49 and nays 0 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senator Broden added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senator Buck added second sponsor. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Education and Career Development |
2014-01-28 | House | Representative Klinker added as coauthor. |
2014-01-27 | House | Senator Yoder added as sponsor. |
2014-01-27 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 64: yeas 94 and nays 0 |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2014-01-23 | House | Amendment #1 (McNamara), prevailed. |
2014-01-23 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2014-01-21 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2014-01-09 | House | First Reading: Referred to Education |
2014-01-09 | House | Authored by Representative McNamara. |