IN HB1061 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-20 - Senator Buck added as third sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-20 - Senator Buck added as third sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Asbestos litigation. Specifies causes of action that may constitute a product liability action. Repeals provisions pertaining to product liability actions that are based upon: (1) property damage resulting from asbestos; and (2) personal injury, disability, disease, or death resulting from exposure to asbestos. Requires certain disclosures regarding asbestos bankruptcy trust claims in civil asbestos actions. Provides medical criteria to set aside and preserve the claims of asbestos and silica claimants without physical impairment, and gives priority to asbestos and silica claimants with malignant conditions and impairing nonmalignant conditions. Urges the legislative council to assign to the appropriate interim study committee
Title
Asbestos litigation. Specifies causes of action that may constitute a product liability action. Repeals provisions pertaining to product liability actions that are based upon: (1) property damage resulting from asbestos; and (2) personal injury, disability, disease, or death resulting from exposure to asbestos. Requires certain disclosures regarding asbestos bankruptcy trust claims in civil asbestos actions. Provides medical criteria to set aside and preserve the claims of asbestos and silica claimants without physical impairment, and gives priority to asbestos and silica claimants with malignant conditions and impairing nonmalignant conditions. Urges the legislative council to assign to the appropriate interim study committee
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Lehman [R] | Rep. Gerald Torr [R] | Rep. Todd Huston [R] | Rep. Timothy Brown [R] |
Sen. Rodric Bray [R] | Sen. Travis Holdman [R] | Sen. James Buck [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-05 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 59 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senator Buck added as third sponsor |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senator Holdman added as second sponsor |
2018-02-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Civil Law |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2018-02-05 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Bray |
2018-02-05 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 171: yeas 59, nays 35 |
2018-01-31 | House | Amendment #1 (DeLaney) failed; voice vote |
2018-01-31 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-01-29 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-09 | House | Representatives Torr, Huston, Brown, T. added as coauthors |
2018-01-03 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-01-03 | House | Authored by Representative Lehman |