IN HB1055 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - Senators Taylor and Randolph added as cosponsors
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - Senators Taylor and Randolph added as cosponsors
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows great-grandparents to seek visitation rights with their great-grandchildren in certain circumstances. Allows a grandparent or great- grandparent to seek visitation if the grandparent or great-grandparent has had meaningful contact with the child but, as a result of an estrangement between the parent of the child and the grandparent or great-grandparent, the parent of the child terminated the child's visits with the grandparent or great-grandparent. Establishes factors for the court to consider in determining whether granting a grandparent or great-grandparent visitation rights is in the best interests of the child. Provides that a court may order a party to an action for grandparent or great-grandparent visitation to pay a reasonable amount for the cost to the other party of maintaining or defending the action, including costs for attorney's fees and mediation. Specifies that certain agencies are not required to pay costs. Makes conforming changes.
Title
Grandparent and great-grandparent visitation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-11 | Senators Taylor and Randolph added as cosponsors | |
2010-02-01 | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-01-28 | Senate sponsors: Senators Steele and R. Young | |
2010-01-28 | Referred to the Senate | |
2010-01-28 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 89: Yeas 63, Nays 33 | |
2010-01-26 | Amendment 3 (Messmer), prevailed; Voice Vote | |
2010-01-26 | Amendment 5 (Noe), failed; Voice Vote | |
2010-01-26 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2010-01-21 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2010-01-05 | First reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs | |
2010-01-05 | Coauthored by Representatives Summers and Messmer | |
2010-01-05 | Authored by Representative Stilwell |