IN HB1052 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 153
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Pulaski County local income tax. Provides that a tax imposed by a fiscal body on the adjusted gross income of local taxpayers at a tax rate that does not exceed three-tenths percent (0.3%) expires December 31, 2020. Provides that for calendar years beginning after December 31, 2020, and before January 1, 2036, the county fiscal body may impose a tax on the adjusted gross income of local taxpayers at a tax rate that does not exceed three-tenths percent (0.3%). Amends purposes for which revenue generated from the special purpose tax rate may be used.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pulaski County local income tax.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30HousePublic Law 153
2020-03-21HouseSigned by the Governor
2020-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-09SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2020-03-04HouseSigned by the Speaker
2020-03-04SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2020-03-03SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 279: yeas 41, nays 9
2020-02-27SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-02-25SenateSenator Perfect added as second sponsor
2020-02-25SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2020-02-17SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
2020-01-31HouseReferred to the Senate
2020-01-30HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Charbonneau
2020-01-30HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 141: yeas 88, nays 4
2020-01-29HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-27HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-23HouseRepresentatives Cherry and Klinker added as coauthors
2020-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2020-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Gutwein

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/house/1052/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/d/a/3/dda37a22/HB1052.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/0/e/f/00ef90d1/HB1052.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/9/5/3/d9537dea/HB1052.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/4/7/e/647e5ee5/HB1052.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/b/2/2/8b223118/HB1052.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/0/4/9/c049e31e/HB1052.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/7/a/a/67aaf805/HB1052.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/5/5/a/f55a8c15/HB1052.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/c/4/a/5c4a0571/HB1052.141_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/f/5/3/ff535020/HB1052.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/c/e/3/5ce3f92e/HB1052.279_S.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback