IN HB1047 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 34
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Justice reinvestment advisory council. Specifies the purpose and certain duties of the justice reinvestment advisory council, including the duty to study jail overcrowding, and adds additional members, including members of the Indiana evidence based decision making initiative (which is a partnership between state and local criminal justice stakeholders). Makes a technical correction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Justice reinvestment advisory council.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-04 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-08 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30HousePublic Law 34
2020-03-14HouseSigned by the Governor
2020-03-11SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-09SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2020-03-04HouseSigned by the Speaker
2020-03-04HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 301: yeas 91, nays 0
2020-03-03HouseMotion to concur filed
2020-02-25SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2020-02-24SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 220: yeas 48, nays 0
2020-02-20SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-02-18SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2020-02-18SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-02-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
2020-01-15HouseReferred to the Senate
2020-01-14HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Young M and Koch
2020-01-14HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 23: yeas 93, nays 0
2020-01-13HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-09HouseRepresentatives McNamara and Pierce added as coauthors
2020-01-09HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-06HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2020-01-06HouseAuthored by Representative Steuerwald

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/house/1047/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/7/1/3/8713b318/HB1047.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/f/e/3/2fe3751e/HB1047.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/4/9/c/549cdc76/HB1047.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/2/9/b/429bc302/HB1047.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/b/d/0/9bd0b026/HB1047.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/e/b/4/eeb46bec/HB1047.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/3/7/c/937c5c4e/HB1047.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/6/8/6/e686c071/HB1047.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/e/0/f/5e0f0606/HB1047.23_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/1/2/e/012e3494/HB1047.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/b/1/e/2b1e9c2d/HB1047.220_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/7/1/0/c7108726/HB1047.301_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback