IN HB1045 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-19 - Representative Austin added as coauthor
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-19 - Representative Austin added as coauthor
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
School efficiency grants. Establishes the school efficiency grant program for the purpose of providing grants to school corporations for costs associated with implementing efficiency and cost effective measures. Establishes the school efficiency grant fund.
Title
School efficiency grants. Establishes the school efficiency grant program for the purpose of providing grants to school corporations for costs associated with implementing efficiency and cost effective measures. Establishes the school efficiency grant fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-14 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-19 | House | Representative Austin added as coauthor |
2016-01-14 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2016-01-14 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-01-12 | House | Representative Goodin added as coauthor |
2016-01-12 | House | Representative Burton added as coauthor |
2016-01-05 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2016-01-05 | House | Authored by Representative Frye R |