IN HB1043 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Public Law 246
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Referendum and remonstrance process. Increases the threshold used for purposes of determining whether a capital project is a controlled project as follows: (1) In the case of an ordinance or resolution adopted after December 31, 2017, and before January 1, 2019, making a preliminary determination to issue bonds or to enter into a lease for the project, the threshold is increased from $2,000,000 to $5,000,000. (2) In the case of an ordinance or resolution adopted after December 31, 2018, making a preliminary determination to issue bonds or enter into a lease for the project, the threshold is increased by applying

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Referendum and remonstrance process. Increases the threshold used for purposes of determining whether a capital project is a controlled project as follows: (1) In the case of an ordinance or resolution adopted after December 31, 2017, and before January 1, 2019, making a preliminary determination to issue bonds or to enter into a lease for the project, the threshold is increased from $2,000,000 to $5,000,000. (2) In the case of an ordinance or resolution adopted after December 31, 2018, making a preliminary determination to issue bonds or enter into a lease for the project, the threshold is increased by applying

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 86 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28HousePublic Law 246
2017-04-28HouseSigned by the Governor
2017-04-27SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2017-04-27HouseSigned by the Speaker
2017-04-26SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2017-04-21SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 533: yeas 49, nays 1
2017-04-21HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 558: yeas 86, nays 10
2017-04-21HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2017-04-21SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2017-04-21HouseRepresentative Smith M added as conferee
2017-04-21HouseRepresentative Stemler removed as conferee
2017-04-11SenateSenate advisors appointed: Holdman, Breaux and Freeman
2017-04-11SenateSenate conferees appointed: Hershman and Niezgodski
2017-04-10HouseHouse advisors appointed: Karickhoff, Clere and Pryor
2017-04-10HouseHouse conferees appointed: Thompson and Stemler
2017-04-10HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2017-04-10HouseMotion to dissent filed
2017-04-06SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2017-04-06SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 407: yeas 47, nays 1
2017-04-04SenateSenator Holdman added as second sponsor
2017-04-04SenateAmendment #1 (Hershman) prevailed; voice vote
2017-04-04SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-03-30SenateSenator Niezgodski added as cosponsor
2017-03-27SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-02-23SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
2017-02-21HouseReferred to the Senate
2017-02-20HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Hershman
2017-02-20HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 156: yeas 95, nays 2
2017-02-16HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2017-02-14HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-02-13HouseRepresentative Stemler added as coauthor
2017-01-09HouseRepresentative Clere added as coauthor
2017-01-04HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2017-01-04HouseAuthored by Representative Thompson

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2017/bills/house/1043/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/e/0/f/3e0f2da5/HB1043.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/e/6/d/9e6d5cd6/HB1043.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/f/c/b/4fcbca38/HB1043.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/d/d/f/0ddfba69/HB1043.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/0/a/b/90ab870c/HB1043.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/d/0/9/cd09fb90/HB1043.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/7/4/4/37442c1e/HB1043.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/2/1/a/c21a65d6/HB1043.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/c/5/c/2c5cc595/HB1043.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/b/2/a/4b2a1eda/HB1043.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/d/7/0/6d70388e/HB1043.156.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/3/f/5/73f55e12/HB1043.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/2/0/b/520bcbb7/HB1043.407.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/2/5/e/725ea199/HB1043.558.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/4/5/d/a45d6e27/HB1043.533.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback