IN HB1039 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Public Law 29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Military award license plates. Provides that the surviving spouse of a Purple Heart recipient may retain the Purple Heart specialty license plate as long as the surviving spouse does not remarry. Specifies that the surviving spouse is not eligible to receive a modified disability registration plate. Establishes the Armed Forces Expeditionary Medal specialty license plate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Military award license plates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-08HousePublic Law 29
2021-04-08HouseSigned by the Governor
2021-04-07SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-03-15SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-03-11HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-03-09SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2021-03-08SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 210: yeas 48, nays 1
2021-03-04SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-03-02SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-02-18SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
2021-02-05HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-02-04HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Zay, Busch, Garten
2021-02-04HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 58: yeas 95, nays 0
2021-02-02HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-01-28HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-04HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
2021-01-04HouseCoauthored by Representatives Abbott, Frye R, Morris
2021-01-04HouseAuthored by Representative Judy

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1039/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/1/7/3/e173936d/HB1039.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/4/d/7/b4d73e8c/HB1039.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/c/2/1/fc214b6e/HB1039.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/b/c/d/8bcdd134/HB1039.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/b/1/3/6b134d6a/HB1039.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/9/a/8/49a870a0/HB1039.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/5/1/c/951c34ce/HB1039.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/5/1/4/d514c51f/HB1039.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/3/a/f/83af801b/HB1039.05.ENRS.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/2/d/f/82df0fde/HB1039.02.COMH.AMH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/f/a/a/afaa385d/HB1039.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/2/1/d/121d8934/HB1039.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/c/b/d/4cbdcb93/HB1039.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/a/1/2/0a1234b9/HB1039.02.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/4/3/d/543d397d/HB1039.02.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/8/c/f/a8cf45f2/HB1039.03.ENGH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/6/0/8/8608532d/HB1039.03.ENGH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/d/c/a/cdcada67/HB1039.03.ENGH.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/2/d/1/02d115b2/HB1039.04.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/1/f/4/b1f431e0/HB1039.04.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/a/1/d/1a1ddf19/HB1039.04.COMS.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/0/5/d/105d2a3d/HB1039.05.ENRS.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/a/2/a/6a2ae83a/HB1039.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/7/3/a/173a3a80/HB1039.58_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/c/5/4/bc54f3ec/HB1039.03.ENGH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/3/e/e/93ee92f9/HB1039.210_S.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback