IN HB1037 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that: (1) broadcasters shall develop comprehensive and coordinated plans for preparation for and responding appropriately to an emergency or disaster; and (2) any statewide organization or a member of a statewide organization that represents broadcasters may establish a program for training and certifying broadcast engineers and technical personnel as first response broadcasters. Provides that: (1) communications service providers shall develop comprehensive and coordinated plans for preparation for and responding appropriately to an emergency or disaster; and (2) any statewide organization or a member of a statewide organization that represents communications service providers may establish a program for training and certifying broadcast engineers and technical personnel as first response broadcasters. Makes technical corrections.
Title
Broadcasters during emergencies or disasters.
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Mahan [R] | Rep. Randall Frye [R] | Rep. Dan Forestal [D] | Rep. John Price [R] |
Sen. James Arnold [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - House - House - Motion to Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Homeland Security, Transportation, and Veterans Affairs - Roll Call 103702 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - House - House Floor - (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - House - House Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety - Roll Call 103701 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Homeland Security, Transportation, and Veterans Affairs - Roll Call 103702 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - House - House Floor - (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - House - House Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety - Roll Call 103701 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-26 | House | Public Law 172 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-05 | House | Motion to Concur in Senate Amendments: prevailed; Roll Call 412: yeas 87 and nays 0 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 282: yeas 48 and nays 0 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Homeland Security, Transportation, and Veterans Affairs |
2014-01-16 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 22: yeas 95 and nays 0 |
2014-01-16 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2014-01-16 | House | Senator Crider added as first sponsor. |
2014-01-16 | House | Senator Holdman added as second sponsor. |
2014-01-16 | House | Senator Merritt added as third sponsor. |
2014-01-16 | House | Senator Arnold added as cosponsor. |
2014-01-15 | House | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-13 | House | Committee report: do pass amend, adopted. |
2014-01-07 | House | First Reading: Referred to Veterans Affairs and Public Safety |
2014-01-07 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Frye R, Forestal |
2014-01-07 | House | Authored by Representative Mahan |
2014-01-07 | House | Representative Price added as coauthor. |