IN HB1033 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Residency of police officers and firefighters. Revises residency requirements for members of police and fire departments to require that members: (1) have adequate means of transportation into the jurisdiction served by the member's department; and (2) maintain telephone service to communicate with the department.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Residency of police officers and firefighters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-25 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 68 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 78 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-08HouseSigned by the Governor
2021-04-07SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-03-31SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-03-29HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-03-25HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 302: yeas 68, nays 20
2021-03-22HouseMotion to concur filed
2021-03-17SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2021-03-16SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 227: yeas 49, nays 0
2021-03-15SenateSenator Niezgodski added as cosponsor
2021-03-15SenateAmendment #2 (Sandlin) prevailed; voice vote
2021-03-15SenateReread second time: amended, ordered engrossed
2021-03-09SenatePlaced back on second reading
2021-03-09SenateSenator Raatz added as cosponsor
2021-03-09SenateSenator Gaskill added as second sponsor
2021-03-08SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-03-02SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-02-18SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
2021-02-03HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-02-02HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Sandlin
2021-02-02HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 35: yeas 78, nays 16
2021-02-01HouseRepresentative Bartels added as coauthor
2021-02-01HouseRepresentatives Gutwein and Gore M added as coauthors
2021-02-01HouseAmendment #1 (Hatcher) failed; voice vote
2021-02-01HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-01-28HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-01-04HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety
2021-01-04HouseAuthored by Representative Frye R

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1033/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/4/b/8/a4b8e304/HB1033.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/a/d/a/4ada36af/HB1033.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/e/7/d/1e7d24db/HB1033.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/5/2/0/95205e16/HB1033.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/5/3/2/653240ca/HB1033.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/6/8/2/a682081b/HB1033.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/7/9/0/c790ec59/HB1033.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/6/8/a/568a2606/HB1033.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/d/1/9/6d196681/HB1033.05.ENRS.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/4/4/4/24442cb1/HB1033.02.COMH.AMH001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/2/0/e/020e9178/HB1033.03.COMS.AMS001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/d/7/0/9d70e3ae/HB1033.03.COMS.AMS002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/9/b/3/e9b39e1a/HB1033.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/5/2/6/6526ad09/HB1033.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/1/a/0/91a09620/HB1033.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/5/8/a/958ac45b/HB1033.02.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/8/7/1/7871caa8/HB1033.02.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/2/d/6/02d6dc43/HB1033.03.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/b/c/1/0bc13460/HB1033.02.COMH.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/6/4/d/b64d183c/HB1033.03.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/3/0/e/130e2aa2/HB1033.04.ENGS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/f/7/d/7f7d54a9/HB1033.04.ENGS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/6/a/6/46a66791/HB1033.04.ENGS.CON01.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/2/c/b/92cb5ca3/HB1033.05.ENRS.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/6/2/a/762a7f24/HB1033.01.INTR.03.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/b/3/b/ab3bd59e/HB1033.35_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/2/a/a/72aa1500/HB1033.02.COMH.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/3/7/2/83727584/HB1033.227_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/0/7/a/007ac2d5/HB1033.302_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback