IN HB1028 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
Pending: Senate Corrections & Criminal Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Operating while intoxicated. Provides a defense to prosecution for a person who operates a vehicle with marijuana or its metabolite in the person's blood under certain conditions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Operating while intoxicated.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 79 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
2021-02-23HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-02-22HouseRepresentative Lindauer added as coauthor
2021-02-22HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Young M
2021-02-22HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 233: yeas 79, nays 15
2021-02-18HouseAmendment #1 (Lucas) prevailed; voice vote
2021-02-18HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2021-02-17HouseRepresentatives Bartels and Campbell added as coauthors
2021-02-16HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-04HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2021-01-04HouseAuthored by Representative Lucas

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1028/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/a/d/9/4ad9670f/HB1028.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/3/a/2/13a2cc60/HB1028.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/9/c/f/c9cf7b2f/HB1028.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/7/0/0/07006016/HB1028.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/9/9/1/3991be58/HB1028.03.ENGH.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/b/9/f/cb9fc76f/HB1028.02.COMH.AMH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/2/1/b/321bf621/HB1028.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/f/4/9/3f491d43/HB1028.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/f/3/2/bf32230f/HB1028.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/9/7/7/6977a027/HB1028.03.ENGH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/5/8/1/f581ca82/HB1028.03.ENGH.FN002.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/6/5/2/66522d40/HB1028.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/e/c/2/eec2ec19/HB1028.233_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback