IN HB1024 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-11 - Representative Macer added as coauthor
Pending: House Roads and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Safety rest areas. Requires the office of management and budget to: (1) investigate transferring maintenance responsibilities for safety rest areas from the Indiana department of transportation to the office of tourism development; and (2) report its findings to the legislative council before November 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Safety rest areas. Requires the office of management and budget to: (1) investigate transferring maintenance responsibilities for safety rest areas from the Indiana department of transportation to the office of tourism development; and (2) report its findings to the legislative council before November 1, 2019.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-11HouseRepresentative Macer added as coauthor
2019-01-17HouseRepresentative Moseley added as coauthor
2019-01-03HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
2019-01-03HouseCoauthored by Representative Harris
2019-01-03HouseAuthored by Representative Aylesworth

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback