IN HB1024 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Public Law 19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Public Law 19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Heat preparedness training for coaches. Provides that head coaches and assistant coaches who coach interscholastic sports or intramural sports must complete a certified coaching education course that includes content for prevention of or response to heat related medical issues that may arise from a student athlete's training.
Title
Heat preparedness training for coaches. Provides that head coaches and assistant coaches who coach interscholastic sports or intramural sports must complete a certified coaching education course that includes content for prevention of or response to heat related medical issues that may arise from a student athlete's training.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 40 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | Public Law 19 |
2018-03-08 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2018-03-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Senator Holdman added as cosponsor |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 244: yeas 40, nays 10 |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as cosponsor |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Senator Melton added as cosponsor |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Senator Grooms added as third sponsor |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Senator Raatz added as second sponsor |
2018-02-01 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2018-01-25 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2018-01-25 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Kruse |
2018-01-25 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 49: yeas 91, nays 0 |
2018-01-23 | House | Amendment #1 (Bacon) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-01-23 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2018-01-18 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-08 | House | Representatives Cook, Heaton, Klinker added as coauthors |
2018-01-03 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2018-01-03 | House | Authored by Representative Bacon |