IN HB1024 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Public Law 220
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Public Law 220
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prayer in schools. Provides that a school corporation or charter school shall not discriminate against a student or a student's parent on the basis of a religious viewpoint or religious expression. Provides that students may express their beliefs about religion in homework, artwork, and other written and oral assignments free from discrimination based on the religious content of their submissions. Provides that public school students may pray or engage in religious activities or religious expression before, during, and after the school day in the same manner and to the same extent that students may engage in nonreligious activities or expression.
Title
Prayer in schools. Provides that a school corporation or charter school shall not discriminate against a student or a student's parent on the basis of a religious viewpoint or religious expression. Provides that students may express their beliefs about religion in homework, artwork, and other written and oral assignments free from discrimination based on the religious content of their submissions. Provides that public school students may pray or engage in religious activities or religious expression before, during, and after the school day in the same manner and to the same extent that students may engage in nonreligious activities or expression.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-13 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 78 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 83 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 83 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | House | Public Law 220 |
2017-04-27 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-04-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-04-13 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 482: yeas 79, nays 7 |
2017-04-12 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senator Koch added as cosponsor |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senator Crane added as cosponsor |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 325: yeas 44, nays 5 |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-03-01 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2017-02-28 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2017-02-27 | House | Cosponsor: Senator Merritt |
2017-02-27 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Kruse, Randolph Lonnie M and Taylor G |
2017-02-27 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 238: yeas 83, nays 12 |
2017-02-23 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-02-21 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-02-20 | House | Representative Burton added as coauthor |
2017-01-12 | House | Representatives Arnold and Borders added as coauthors |
2017-01-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2017-01-04 | House | Authored by Representative Bartlett |