IN HB1024 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-07 - Authored by Representative Neese
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-07 - Authored by Representative Neese
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that if an action of a state or local governmental entity taken after June 30, 2014, to enforce or otherwise apply a law or other regulation: (1) creates an inordinate burden on, restriction on, or limitation of real property rights on an existing use of private real property or a vested right to a specific use of private real property; and (2) the action does not constitute a taking of private real property under the Constitution of the State of Indiana or the Constitution of the United States; the property owner is entitled to relief, including compensation for the actual loss to the fair market value of the real property, by bringing an action in the circuit court that has jurisdiction in the county in which the real property is located. Establishes the procedures the private real property owner must follow to: (1) bring and maintain the action; and (2) receive compensation.
Title
Protection of private real property rights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-27 - House - House Floor - (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House Committee on Insurance - Roll Call 105801 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House Committee on Insurance - Roll Call 105801 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-07 | House | Authored by Representative Neese |
2014-01-07 | House | First Reading: Referred to Judiciary |