IN HB1024 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Removes a requirement that the insurance producer's contact information be included in written notice concerning a change in a residential policy and requires that the notice indicate that the insurance producer or insurer may be contacted concerning the change. Exempts coverage for certain motor vehicles used for authorized purposes in connection with a commercial policy from the law requiring an insurer to make available uninsured and underinsured motorist coverage. Requires an insurer to provide a written notice of residential policy cancellation in a foreclosure action under certain circumstances. Requires the creditor in a residential property foreclosure action to send a copy of the complaint to the insurance company of record.
Title
Property insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-25 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-16 | Effective 07/01/2011 | |
2011-05-16 | Public Law 116 | |
2011-05-09 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-02 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-04-28 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2011-04-27 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2011-04-25 | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 636: yeas 90, nays 0 | |
2011-04-07 | Returned to the House with amendments | |
2011-04-07 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 310: yeas 48 and nays 1 | |
2011-04-05 | Amendment 5 (Holdman), prevailed; | |
2011-04-05 | Amendment 3 (Steele), prevailed; | |
2011-04-05 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2011-03-24 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2011-02-17 | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions | |
2011-01-25 | Senate sponsors: Senators Holdman and Paul | |
2011-01-25 | Referred to the Senate | |
2011-01-25 | Representative Bardon added as coauthor | |
2011-01-25 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 24: yeas 97, nays 0 | |
2011-01-24 | Amendment 3 (Lehman), prevailed; voice vote | |
2011-01-24 | Amendment 2 (Dermody), prevailed; voice vote | |
2011-01-24 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2011-01-20 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-05 | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance | |
2011-01-05 | Authored by Representative Lehman |