IN HB1024 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-25 - Representative Goodin added as coauthor
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides a 100% income tax deduction, beginning in 2014, for federal civil service annuity income received by an individual or the individual's surviving spouse. Phases in the deduction from 2010 through 2013.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taxation of civil service annuities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-01-25 Representative Goodin added as coauthor
2010-01-19 Representative Cherry added as coauthor
2010-01-11 Representative Welch added as coauthor
2010-01-05 First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2010-01-05 Authored by Representative Robertson

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback