IN HB1021 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-05 - Public Law 238
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Education finance. Replaces references to pre-2019 school funds with references to conform to the education funding and accounting changes made by HEA 1009-2017 and HEA 1167-2018. Extends (through 2023) the ability in current law for a school corporation to allocate circuit breaker credits proportionately (without taking protected taxes into account) under certain circumstances. Provides that credits attributable to new debt incurred by the school corporation after June 30, 2019, shall not be included in determining the school corporation's eligibility to allocate circuit breaker credits proportionately. Provides that the amount of credits that the school corporation may allocate proportionately is determined based on a calculation of the percentage amount of credits granted against the school corporation's levy for its operations fund compared to the school corporation's levy for its operations fund. Provides for the calculation of the growth in the maximum levy for a school corporation's operation fund to be based on an assessed value growth quotient (AVGQ) using the average annual growth in net assessed value over the most recent three year period. Provides for a ceiling of 4% plus the statewide AVGQ and a floor of the statewide AVGQ. Removes a requirement concerning an estimate of: (1) the source of all revenue to be dedicated to a school corporation's proposed capital expenditures in the upcoming calendar year; and (2) the amount of property taxes to be collected in the upcoming calendar year and retained in the fund for capital expenditures proposed for a later year; from the format of a school corporation's capital expenditures plan. Provides for an adjustment to the Evansville Vanderburgh School Corporation operations fund levy for 2020 to fund a historical society supporting Bosse Field (The 2019 operations fund levy did not recognize the historical society fund levy that was imposed in 2018). Makes technical corrections. Requires a school corporation to submit to the department of local government finance's computer gateway the school corporation's: (1) capital projects expenditure plan; and (2) school bus replacement plan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education finance. Replaces references to pre-2019 school funds with references to conform to the education funding and accounting changes made by HEA 1009-2017 and HEA 1167-2018. Extends (through 2023) the ability in current law for a school corporation to allocate circuit breaker credits proportionately (without taking protected taxes into account) under certain circumstances. Provides that credits attributable to new debt incurred by the school corporation after June 30, 2019, shall not be included in determining the school corporation's eligibility to allocate circuit breaker credits proportionately. Provides that the amount of credits that the school corporation may allocate proportionately is determined based on a calculation of the percentage amount of credits granted against the school corporation's levy for its operations fund compared to the school corporation's levy for its operations fund. Provides for the calculation of the growth in the maximum levy for a school corporation's operation fund to be based on an assessed value growth quotient (AVGQ) using the average annual growth in net assessed value over the most recent three year period. Provides for a ceiling of 4% plus the statewide AVGQ and a floor of the statewide AVGQ. Removes a requirement concerning an estimate of: (1) the source of all revenue to be dedicated to a school corporation's proposed capital expenditures in the upcoming calendar year; and (2) the amount of property taxes to be collected in the upcoming calendar year and retained in the fund for capital expenditures proposed for a later year; from the format of a school corporation's capital expenditures plan. Provides for an adjustment to the Evansville Vanderburgh School Corporation operations fund levy for 2020 to fund a historical society supporting Bosse Field (The 2019 operations fund levy did not recognize the historical society fund levy that was imposed in 2018). Makes technical corrections. Requires a school corporation to submit to the department of local government finance's computer gateway the school corporation's: (1) capital projects expenditure plan; and (2) school bus replacement plan.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-05HousePublic Law 238
2019-05-05HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-24SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-24HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-23HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 602: yeas 92, nays 0
2019-04-23SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 576: yeas 48, nays 0
2019-04-23SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2019-04-23HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2019-04-08SenateSenate advisors appointed: Buchanan, Melton, Spartz and Niezgodski
2019-04-08SenateSenate conferees appointed: Bassler and Tallian
2019-04-08HouseHouse advisors appointed: Judy, Steuerwald, Campbell, Hatfield and Pryor
2019-04-08HouseHouse conferees appointed: Thompson and Klinker
2019-04-02HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2019-04-01HouseMotion to dissent filed
2019-03-29SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2019-03-28SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 340: yeas 47, nays 1
2019-03-21SenateAmendment #4 (Bassler) prevailed; voice vote
2019-03-21SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-03-19SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2019-03-14SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-02-27SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-29HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-01-28HouseRepresentative Steuerwald added as coauthor
2019-01-28HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Bassler and Melton
2019-01-28HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 46: yeas 97, nays 0
2019-01-24HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-01-22HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-17HouseRepresentative Klinker added as coauthor
2019-01-03HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-01-03HouseAuthored by Representative Thompson

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1021/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/0/0/7/f007e370/HB1021.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/2/a/f/12afd427/HB1021.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/0/5/b/205ba406/HB1021.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/0/5/e/a05ea578/HB1021.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/e/f/a/defafd6d/HB1021.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/e/3/5/de35610e/HB1021.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/0/6/e/606e9c8f/HB1021.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/9/9/6/19964831/HB1021.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/e/5/d/ae5deb5f/HB1021.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/b/d/4/9bd4a6f5/HB1021.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/8/9/e/589e6e57/HB1021.46.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/0/f/e/e0fecdf6/HB1021.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/c/b/5/bcb5e1e9/HB1021.340.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/2/d/b/e2db8c1f/HB1021.602.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/e/e/f/0eef2102/HB1021.576.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback