IN HB1021 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-01 - First reading: referred to Committee on Civil Law
Pending: Senate Civil Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-01 - First reading: referred to Committee on Civil Law
Pending: Senate Civil Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Mechanic's liens. Permits a person to discharge a mechanic's lien by filing an indemnification or payment bond with the recorder's office in an amount equal to at least 150% of the lien. Requires the surety responsible for issuing an indemnification or payment bond to: (1) be authorized to do business in Indiana; and (2) be rated at least "A-" by at least one (1) nationally recognized investment rating service. Specifies certain requirements concerning the recording of an indemnification or payment bond. Repeals the current statute concerning the filing of an undertaking to discharge a lien.
Title
Mechanic's liens. Permits a person to discharge a mechanic's lien by filing an indemnification or payment bond with the recorder's office in an amount equal to at least 150% of the lien. Requires the surety responsible for issuing an indemnification or payment bond to: (1) be authorized to do business in Indiana; and (2) be rated at least "A-" by at least one (1) nationally recognized investment rating service. Specifies certain requirements concerning the recording of an indemnification or payment bond. Repeals the current statute concerning the filing of an undertaking to discharge a lien.
Sponsors
Rep. Gerald Torr [R] | Rep. Gregory Steuerwald [R] | Rep. Edward DeLaney [D] | Rep. Christopher Judy [R] |
Sen. Rodric Bray [R] | Sen. John Ruckelshaus [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Civil Law |
2018-01-23 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2018-01-22 | House | Representative Judy added as coauthor |
2018-01-22 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Bray and Ruckelshaus |
2018-01-22 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 23: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2018-01-18 | House | Representatives Steuerwald and DeLaney added as coauthors |
2018-01-18 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-01-16 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-03 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-01-03 | House | Authored by Representative Torr |