IN HB1021 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-17 - Public Law 35
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Limit on mine subsidence insurance coverage. Raises the maximum amount of mine subsidence insurance coverage that may be reinsured (and thus the maximum amount of mine subsidence coverage that is available) from $200,000 per structure to $500,000 per structure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limit on mine subsidence insurance coverage. Raises the maximum amount of mine subsidence insurance coverage that may be reinsured (and thus the maximum amount of mine subsidence coverage that is available) from $200,000 per structure to $500,000 per structure.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-17 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Senate Committee on Insurance & Financial Institutions - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-01-14 - House - House Committee on Insurance - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-17HousePublic Law 35
2015-04-17HouseSigned by the Governor
2015-04-16SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-04-07SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2015-03-23HouseSigned by the Speaker
2015-03-18SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2015-03-17SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2015-03-17SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 295: yeas 48, nays 1
2015-03-16SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-03-12SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2015-02-24SenateFirst Reading: Referred to committee on Insurance & Financial Institutions
2015-02-22HouseReferred to the Senate
2015-01-27HouseSenator Stoops added as cosponsor
2015-01-27HouseSenator Ford added third sponsor
2015-01-27HouseSenator Messmer added second sponsor
2015-01-27HouseSenator Becker added first sponsor
2015-01-22HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 13: yeas 91, nays 0
2015-01-20HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-01-14HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2015-01-12HouseRepresentatives Pierce, Ubelhor, Kersey added as coauthors
2015-01-06HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Insurance
2015-01-06HouseAuthored by Representative Bacon

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2015/bills/house/1021/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/8/b/5/c8b575a7/HB1021.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/1/1/8/41186396/HB1021.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/6/7/d/667d96db/HB1021.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/1/2/f/712f8dca/HB1021.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/9/d/9/d9d956b0/HB1021.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/e/4/1/6e4192e2/HB1021.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/f/e/7/8fe7d93f/HB1021.04.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/f/5/3/5f53e0ce/HB1021.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/3/0/c/030c42a1/HB1021.02.COMH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/3/f/8/03f8b209/HB1021.295.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/2/0/1/b201418c/HB1021.13.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback