IN HB1019 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Public Law 252
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Common construction wage and public works. Repeals the common construction wage statute. Repeals related statutes superseded by the repeal of the common construction wage statute. Increases the "small project" cap for a public works project from $150,000 to $300,000. Unless required by federal or state law, prohibits a public agency from establishing, mandating, or otherwise requiring a wage scale or wage schedule for a public works project. Provides that the following apply to all public works projects, except public-private, design-build, and construction manager as constructor agreements: (1) Provides that a public works contract may not be structured other than in

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Common construction wage and public works. Repeals the common construction wage statute. Repeals related statutes superseded by the repeal of the common construction wage statute. Increases the "small project" cap for a public works project from $150,000 to $300,000. Unless required by federal or state law, prohibits a public agency from establishing, mandating, or otherwise requiring a wage scale or wage schedule for a public works project. Provides that the following apply to all public works projects, except public-private, design-build, and construction manager as constructor agreements: (1) Provides that a public works contract may not be structured other than in

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-16 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 54 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 27 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #6 (Mrvan) failed (Y: 15 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #17 (Tallian) failed (Y: 12 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #12 (Broden) failed (Y: 12 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 55 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House - Committee report (Y: 68 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-06HousePublic Law 252
2015-05-06HouseSigned by the Governor
2015-04-28SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-04-23SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2015-04-23HouseSigned by the Speaker
2015-04-16HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 481: yeas 54, nays 40
2015-04-16HouseMotion to concur filed
2015-04-16SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2015-04-15SenateSenator Hershman added as cosponsor
2015-04-15SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 451: yeas 27, nays 22
2015-04-14SenateAmendment #6 (Mrvan) failed; Roll Call 435: yeas 15, nays 34
2015-04-14SenateAmendment #17 (Tallian) failed; Roll Call 434: yeas 12, nays 36
2015-04-14SenateAmendment #21 (Walker) prevailed; voice vote
2015-04-14SenateAmendment #20 (Walker) prevailed; voice vote
2015-04-14SenateAmendment #12 (Broden) failed; Roll Call 433: yeas 12, nays 37
2015-04-14SenateAmendment #27 (Hershman) prevailed; voice vote
2015-04-14SenateAmendment #18 (Charbonneau) prevailed; voice vote
2015-04-14SenateAmendment #25 (Hershman) prevailed; voice vote
2015-04-14SenateAmendment #1 (Yoder) prevailed; voice vote
2015-04-14SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2015-04-07SenateSenator Miller, Pete added as cosponsor
2015-04-07SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-03-19SenateSenator Schneider added as cosponsor
2015-03-19SenateSenator Smith added as cosponsor
2015-03-19SenateSenator Bassler added as third sponsor
2015-03-17SenateSenator Kruse added as second sponsor
2015-02-25SenateFirst Reading: Referred to committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy
2015-02-24HouseReferred to the Senate
2015-02-23HouseRepresentative Carbaugh added as coauthor
2015-02-23HouseSenator Yoder added as sponsor
2015-02-23HouseRule 105.1 suspended
2015-02-23HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 205: yeas 55, nays 41
2015-02-19HouseRepresentative Burton added as coauthor
2015-02-19HouseRule 105.1 suspended
2015-02-19HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-02-17HouseRepresentative Richardson added as coauthor
2015-02-17HouseRepresentative Lucas added as coauthor
2015-02-17HouseRule 105.1 suspended
2015-02-17HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted Roll Call 156: yeas 68, nays 27
2015-02-16HouseRepresentatives DeVon, Speedy, Cook, Ziemke, Price added as coauthors
2015-02-16HouseRepresentative Clere added as coauthor
2015-02-16HouseRule 105.1 suspended
2015-02-12HouseRepresentatives Bosma and Brown, T. added as coauthor
2015-01-06HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
2015-01-06HouseAuthored by Representative Torr

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2015/bills/house/1019/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/9/1/7/1917bf37/HB1019.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/0/6/f/006f18ed/HB1019.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/3/9/1/f39185d0/HB1019.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/3/1/3/831333bb/HB1019.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/3/d/5/83d59f92/HB1019.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/c/2/3/ec231dd5/HB1019.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/0/c/2/e0c25ea8/HB1019.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/e/2/f/ce2f395b/HB1019.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/4/3/6/24364817/HB1019.05.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/f/6/4/af643eff/HB1019.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/c/5/a/bc5a9123/HB1019.156.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/8/7/5/6875b032/HB1019.205.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/0/6/8/80685252/HB1019.02.COMH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/e/1/6/be16249b/HB1019.433.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/3/1/1/e3119880/HB1019.434.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/d/9/a/7d9a5ffb/HB1019.435.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/8/f/5/98f52140/HB1019.451.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/7/9/3/c793a67d/HB1019.481.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback