IN HB1016 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-4)
Status: Passed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Public Law 61
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-4)
Status: Passed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Public Law 61
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Newborn safety incubators. Requires the commission on improving the status of children in Indiana to submit, before January 1, 2016, to the general assembly and the governor's office recommendations concerning: (1) new methods or mechanisms for carrying out policies relating to abandoned children; and (2) the production and distribution of information and posting of uniform signs regarding certain laws regarding emergency custody of abandoned children. Requires the state department of health to prepare and submit, before January 1, 2016, to the general assembly and the governor's office recommendations concerning standards and protocols for the installation and operation of newborn safety
Title
Newborn safety incubators. Requires the commission on improving the status of children in Indiana to submit, before January 1, 2016, to the general assembly and the governor's office recommendations concerning: (1) new methods or mechanisms for carrying out policies relating to abandoned children; and (2) the production and distribution of information and posting of uniform signs regarding certain laws regarding emergency custody of abandoned children. Requires the state department of health to prepare and submit, before January 1, 2016, to the general assembly and the governor's office recommendations concerning standards and protocols for the installation and operation of newborn safety
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-16 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Provider Services - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House Committee on Public Health - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Provider Services - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House Committee on Public Health - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-27 | House | Public Law 61 |
2015-04-27 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-04-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-16 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 461: yeas 85, nays 0 |
2015-04-15 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Senator Steele added as cosponsor |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 371: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as cosponsor |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Senator Houchin added as cosponsor |
2015-03-02 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to committee on Health & Provider Services |
2015-02-25 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-02-24 | House | Representative Hale added as coauthor |
2015-02-24 | House | Senator Banks A added as cosponsor |
2015-02-24 | House | Senator Kruse added as third sponsor |
2015-02-24 | House | Senator Holdman added as second sponsor |
2015-02-24 | House | Senator Merritt added as sponsor |
2015-02-24 | House | Rule 105.1 suspended |
2015-02-24 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 232: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2015-02-23 | House | Representatives Ober, Zent, Bacon, Lucas, McNamara, Arnold, Judy, Carbaugh, Ubelhor, Morris added as coauthors |
2015-02-23 | House | Rule 105.1 suspended |
2015-02-23 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-02-19 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-02-16 | House | Representative Sullivan added as coauthor |
2015-02-10 | House | Representatives Clere and Brown, C. added as coauthor |
2015-01-06 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2015-01-06 | House | Authored by Representative Cox |