IN HB1014 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-10 - First Reading: Referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-10 - First Reading: Referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Allows a court, in a dissolution of marriage case, to: (1) conduct a final hearing; or (2) enter a summary dissolution decree; at any time after a petition or counter petition for dissolution has been filed if a party to the action has been convicted of a crime of domestic violence against the other party or against any child living in the same household as a party. (Current law prohibits a court from conducting a final hearing or entering a summary dissolution decree earlier than 60 days after a petition or counter petition has been filed.) Requires the court to: (1) conduct the final hearing; or (2) enter a summary dissolution; as soon as practicable. Allows a family law arbitrator to enter a summary dissolution decree at any time after a petition for dissolution has been filed if a party to the action has been convicted of a crime of domestic violence against the other party or against any child living in the same household as a party. (Current law prohibits a family law arbitrator from entering a summary dissolution decree earlier than 60 days after a petition has been filed.)
Title
Dissolution in cases of domestic violence.
Sponsors
Rep. Rebecca Kubacki [R] | Rep. Vanessa Summers [D] | Rep. Cindy Kirchhofer [R] | Rep. Charles Moseley [D] |
Rep. Milo Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-03 - House - House - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House Committee on Judiciary - Roll Call 101401 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House Committee on Judiciary - Roll Call 101401 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-10 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Judiciary |
2014-02-03 | House | Senator Breaux added second sponsor. |
2014-02-03 | House | Representative M. Smith added as coauthor. |
2014-02-03 | House | Representative Moseley added as coauthor. |
2014-02-03 | House | Representative Kirchhofer added as coauthor. |
2014-02-03 | House | Senator Bray added as sponsor. |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2014-02-03 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 167: yeas 96 and nays 0 |
2014-01-30 | House | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-30 | House | Representative Summers added as coauthor. |
2014-01-28 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-07 | House | First Reading: Referred to Judiciary |
2014-01-07 | House | Authored by Representative Kubacki |