IN HB1014 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 12 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - Senators Rogers and Errington added as cosponsors
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 12 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - Senators Rogers and Errington added as cosponsors
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the duties of the governor's commission on minority and women's business enterprises (commission) to include setting goals for all contracts awarded by a recipient of state grant funds that: (1) involve the use of real property of a city, town, county, township, or school corporation (local unit); and (2) will be paid for in whole or in part with state grant funds. Requires the local unit to report to the commission on the planned and actual participation of minority and women's business enterprises in these contracts. Requires the department of administration to direct contractors to demonstrate a good faith effort to meet participation goals. Requires the commission to work with the department to develop a statement for grantees stating the importance of the use of minority and women's business enterprises.
Title
Use of minority and women's business enterprises.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-11 | Senators Rogers and Errington added as cosponsors | |
2010-02-01 | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Public Policy & Interstate Cooperation | |
2010-01-21 | Representative Clements added as coauthor | |
2010-01-12 | Cosponsors: Senators Randolph and Breaux | |
2010-01-12 | Senate sponsors: Senators Lawson, Becker and Taylor | |
2010-01-12 | Referred to the Senate | |
2010-01-12 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 15: Yeas 79, Nays 18 | |
2010-01-12 | Representative Summers added as coauthor | |
2010-01-12 | Representative Barnes removed as coauthor | |
2010-01-11 | Representative Barnes added as coauthor | |
2010-01-11 | Amendment 2 (Hinkle), withdrawn | |
2010-01-11 | Amendment 1 (Riecken), prevailed; Voice Vote | |
2010-01-11 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2010-01-07 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2010-01-05 | First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform | |
2010-01-05 | Coauthored by Representative Candelaria Reardon | |
2010-01-05 | Authored by Representative Riecken |