IN HB1010 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Public Law 162
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Income tax deductions. Increases the income tax deduction for income from military retirement or survivor's benefits beginning in 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income tax deductions. Increases the income tax deduction for income from military retirement or survivor's benefits beginning in 2019.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 78 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01HousePublic Law 162
2019-05-01HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-24SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-24HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-23SenateConference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 563: yeas 49, nays 0
2019-04-22HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 586: yeas 79, nays 3
2019-04-22SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2019-04-22HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2019-04-15SenateSenate advisors appointed: Buchanan, Niezgodski and Holdman
2019-04-15SenateSenate conferees appointed: Crider and Breaux
2019-04-15HouseHouse advisors appointed: Lauer, Judy, Brown T, Klinker and Wright
2019-04-15HouseHouse conferees appointed: Cherry and Macer
2019-04-11HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2019-04-11HouseMotion to dissent filed
2019-04-10SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2019-04-09SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 420: yeas 48, nays 0
2019-04-08SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2019-04-08SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-04-04SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-04-01SenateSenator Bohacek added as cosponsor
2019-02-27SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-30HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-01-29HouseRepresentative Macer added as coauthor
2019-01-29HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Crider, Buchanan and Holdman
2019-01-29HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 53: yeas 95, nays 3
2019-01-28HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-01-24HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-01-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-01-07HouseCoauthored by Representatives Cook and Gutwein
2019-01-07HouseAuthored by Representative Cherry

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1010/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/5/4/8/95481a1b/HB1010.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/c/8/1/6c81fc2f/HB1010.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/f/4/f/0f4ff0dd/HB1010.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/d/2/a/ed2a96f7/HB1010.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/5/0/c/550cc57c/HB1010.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/3/1/d/b31d3bd3/HB1010.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/a/5/2/ea52a0df/HB1010.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/1/b/5/81b57fcd/HB1010.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/9/0/a/090a9d42/HB1010.53.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/1/c/4/51c4d283/HB1010.02.COMH.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/5/9/2/1592a8a4/HB1010.420.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/1/7/4/2174a685/HB1010.586.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/e/4/b/5e4b912a/HB1010.563.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback