IN HB1009 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Public Law 244
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

School financial management. Provides for the following, effective January 1, 2019: (1) Eliminates the school general fund. (2) Creates an education fund to be used as the exclusive fund to pay expenses allocated to student instruction and learning. (3) Creates an operations fund to replace the capital projects fund, the transportation fund, the school bus replacement fund, an art association or a historical society fund, and the public playground fund. Provides that the levy for a school corporation's operations fund consists of the following separately calculated levies: (1) A transportation levy. (2) A school bus replacement levy. (3) A capital

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School financial management. Provides for the following, effective January 1, 2019: (1) Eliminates the school general fund. (2) Creates an education fund to be used as the exclusive fund to pay expenses allocated to student instruction and learning. (3) Creates an operations fund to replace the capital projects fund, the transportation fund, the school bus replacement fund, an art association or a historical society fund, and the public playground fund. Provides that the levy for a school corporation's operations fund consists of the following separately calculated levies: (1) A transportation levy. (2) A school bus replacement levy. (3) A capital

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-21 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House - Amendment #7 (Smith V) failed (Y: 26 N: 68 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-02-09 - House - House - Amendment #9 (Pelath) failed (Y: 29 N: 66 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-02-09 - House - House - Amendment #4 (Pryor) prevailed (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28HousePublic Law 244
2017-04-28HouseSigned by the Governor
2017-04-27SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2017-04-27HouseSigned by the Speaker
2017-04-26SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2017-04-21SenateConference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 505: yeas 47, nays 3
2017-04-21HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 516: yeas 96, nays 2
2017-04-20SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2017-04-20HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2017-04-12SenateSenate advisors appointed: Mishler, Niezgodski, Eckerty and Bassler
2017-04-12HouseHouse advisors appointed: Brown T, Huston, DeLaney and Errington
2017-04-12SenateSenate conferees appointed: Kenley and Tallian
2017-04-12HouseHouse conferees appointed: Cook and Smith V
2017-04-12HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2017-04-12HouseMotion to dissent filed
2017-04-05SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2017-04-04SenateSenator Mishler added as second sponsor
2017-04-04SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 365: yeas 47, nays 1
2017-04-03SenateSenator Tallian added as cosponsor
2017-04-03SenateAmendment #1 (Tallian) failed; voice vote
2017-04-03SenateAmendment #3 (Kenley) prevailed; voice vote
2017-04-03SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-03-27SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-02-20SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
2017-02-14HouseReferred to the Senate
2017-02-13HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Kenley
2017-02-13HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 96: yeas 92, nays 3
2017-02-09HouseAmendment #3 (Errington) failed; voice vote
2017-02-09HouseAmendment #7 (Smith V) failed; Roll Call 88: yeas 26, nays 68
2017-02-09HouseAmendment #9 (Pelath) failed; Roll Call 87: yeas 29, nays 66
2017-02-09HouseAmendment #4 (Pryor) prevailed; Roll Call 86: yeas 93, nays 1
2017-02-09HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-02-06HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-01-31HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
2017-01-31HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-01-26HouseRepresentative Smith, V. added as coauthor
2017-01-23HouseRepresentative Huston added as coauthor
2017-01-10HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2017-01-10HouseCoauthored by Representative Brown T
2017-01-10HouseAuthored by Representative Cook

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2017/bills/house/1009/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/1/0/f/110fa8df/HB1009.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/8/d/3/78d308c7/HB1009.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/1/7/c/f17c8910/HB1009.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/9/8/f/698f872b/HB1009.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/8/6/c/886c85be/HB1009.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/5/f/2/d5f2ac01/HB1009.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/b/e/6/3be6703d/HB1009.04.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/2/e/f/42efda2c/HB1009.04.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/7/3/4/6734685a/HB1009.05.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/3/2/5/0325c1a0/HB1009.05.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/f/f/1/0ff1c529/HB1009.06.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/3/4/7/6347e2a1/HB1009.06.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/2/2/a/322a03ef/HB1009.07.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/2/a/e/c2ae39c0/HB1009.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/5/e/4/a5e4b8bb/HB1009.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/4/1/a/b41ae059/HB1009.86.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/2/e/5/02e58212/HB1009.87.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/a/2/2/7a22613c/HB1009.88.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/f/2/d/7f2dba6d/HB1009.96.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/9/8/a/498a3f17/HB1009.04.ENGH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/b/a/e/6bae0040/HB1009.365.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/4/6/2/04624539/HB1009.505.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/5/9/5/b595ad05/HB1009.516.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback