IN HB1009 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on May 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-07 - Public Law 214
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Innovation network schools. Provides for innovation network school programs in school corporations. Establishes the career pathways pilot program. Establishes the innovation network school pilot grant. Repeals the article relating to the establishment of innovation network schools by the Indianapolis Public Schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Innovation network schools. Provides for innovation network school programs in school corporations. Establishes the career pathways pilot program. Establishes the innovation network school pilot grant. Repeals the article relating to the establishment of innovation network schools by the Indianapolis Public Schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 72 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Porter) failed (Y: 25 N: 68 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2015-02-16 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House Committee on Education - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-07HousePublic Law 214
2015-05-07HouseSigned by the Governor
2015-05-04SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-05-04SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2015-05-01HouseSigned by the Speaker
2015-04-29HouseRepresentative Smith V removed as conferee
2015-04-29HouseRepresentative Cook added as conferee
2015-04-29SenateSenator Hershman added as conferee
2015-04-29SenateSenator Rogers removed as conferee
2015-04-29HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 582: yeas 72, nays 26
2015-04-29SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 562: yeas 29, nays 20
2015-04-21SenateSenator Leising added as advisor
2015-04-20SenateSenate Advisors appointed: Yoder, Stoops and Ford
2015-04-20SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Kruse and Rogers
2015-04-20HouseHouse Advisors appointed: Thompson, Austin, Errington and Moed
2015-04-20HouseHouse Conferees appointed: Behning and Smith V
2015-04-16HouseHouse dissented from Senate Amendments
2015-04-16HouseMotion to dissent filed
2015-04-16SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2015-04-15SenateSenators Mishler and Kenley added as cosponsor
2015-04-15SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 454: yeas 47, nays 3
2015-04-14SenateAmendment #2 (Leising) prevailed; Division of the Senate: yeas 35, nays 9
2015-04-14SenateAmendment #1 (Leising) prevailed; voice vote
2015-04-14SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2015-04-09SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-04-02SenateCommittee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
2015-03-09SenateSenator Ford added as cosponsor
2015-02-25SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Committee on Education & Career Development
2015-02-24HouseReferred to the Senate
2015-02-23HouseSenator Rogers added as third sponsor
2015-02-23HouseSenator Yoder added as second sponsor
2015-02-23HouseSenator Kruse added as sponsor
2015-02-23HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 204: yeas 95, nays 2
2015-02-19HouseAmendment #1 (Porter) failed; Roll Call 179: yeas 25, nays 68
2015-02-19HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-02-17HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2015-02-05HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
2015-02-05HouseRepresentatives Smith, V. and Austin added as coauthor
2015-02-05HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-01-15HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Education
2015-01-15HouseCoauthored by Representative Thompson
2015-01-15HouseAuthored by Representative Behning

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2015/bills/house/1009/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/0/9/5/5095111c/HB1009.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/b/d/3/2bd31466/HB1009.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/b/e/5/2be506a4/HB1009.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/4/f/c/04fc30e1/HB1009.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/f/c/f/bfcf4cb2/HB1009.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/a/6/e/7a6ef480/HB1009.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/d/f/7/fdf7f9c0/HB1009.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/7/0/a/470ae5f8/HB1009.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/9/8/c/698cbf6d/HB1009.05.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/4/6/e/746e7ae4/HB1009.05.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/d/e/a/fdea2c58/HB1009.06.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/9/2/7/f9272ec8/HB1009.06.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/f/b/f/ffbfa7a6/HB1009.07.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/2/1/a/621aeb2c/HB1009.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/a/a/9/aaa97902/HB1009.02.COMH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/f/d/e/3fde64eb/HB1009.179.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/0/1/9/3019a9ff/HB1009.204.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/4/7/1/14716833/HB1009.03.COMH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/9/3/9/39391693/HB1009.04.COMS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/5/2/9/a529aee5/HB1009.454.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/5/8/9/e589167d/HB1009.582.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/5/9/c/459cbf94/HB1009.562.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback