IN HB1008 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Public Law 167
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Student learning recovery grant program. Establishes the: (1) student learning recovery grant program; and (2) student learning recovery grant program fund (fund). Provides that, to be eligible to receive a grant, an eligible entity must develop and submit a student learning acceleration plan (plan). Establishes requirements for a plan and certain information reporting requirements for those eligible entities that are awarded a grant. Requires, before November 1, 2021, and November 1, 2022, the department of education to prepare and submit a report to the interim committee on education. Appropriates to the fund from the state general fund for the purposes of the program $150,000,000 for the 2021 state fiscal year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Student learning recovery grant program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-14 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 79 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Porter) failed (Y: 28 N: 69 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-02-01 - House - House - Amendment #2 (DeLaney) failed (Y: 29 N: 68 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-01-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-29HousePublic Law 167
2021-04-29HouseSigned by the Governor
2021-04-28SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-04-22SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-04-16HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-04-14HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 439: yeas 79, nays 2
2021-04-13HouseMotion to concur filed
2021-04-06SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2021-04-05SenateSenator Raatz added as cosponsor
2021-04-05SenateSenators Kruse and Becker added as cosponsors
2021-04-05SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 335: yeas 48, nays 0
2021-04-01SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2021-03-30SenateAmendment #1 (Mishler) prevailed; voice vote
2021-03-30SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2021-03-25SenateSenator Qaddoura added as cosponsor
2021-03-25SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-02-11SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
2021-02-03HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-02-02HouseRepresentative Porter added as coauthor
2021-02-02HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Mishler and Messmer
2021-02-02HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 33: yeas 94, nays 2
2021-02-01HouseRepresentative Carbaugh added as coauthor
2021-02-01HouseRepresentative McNamara added as author
2021-02-01HouseRepresentative Carbaugh removed as author
2021-02-01HouseRepresentative McNamara removed as coauthor
2021-02-01HouseAmendment #1 (Porter) failed; Roll Call 18: yeas 28, nays 69
2021-02-01HouseAmendment #2 (DeLaney) failed; Roll Call 17: yeas 29, nays 68
2021-02-01HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-01-28HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2021-01-14HouseCoauthored by Representatives Engleman and McNamara
2021-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Carbaugh

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1008/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/4/c/9/54c9b510/HB1008.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/d/e/4/ade4d7cd/HB1008.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/d/4/8/6d48cd82/HB1008.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/6/5/6/a6569513/HB1008.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/0/d/3/c0d363f8/HB1008.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/5/8/4/c5846b71/HB1008.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/0/4/3/50434fb4/HB1008.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/0/8/8/1088d291/HB1008.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/9/b/0/d9b0deb1/HB1008.05.ENRS.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/9/9/3/29933965/HB1008.02.COMH.AMH001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/5/d/a/b5da36dc/HB1008.02.COMH.AMH002.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/7/1/0/f7102f99/HB1008.02.COMH.AMH003.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/f/9/0/cf907bae/HB1008.03.COMS.AMS001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/9/0/e/090eec67/HB1008.03.COMS.AMS002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/6/9/5/66953d31/HB1008.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/f/3/7/1f373763/HB1008.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/0/6/4/506400f5/HB1008.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/f/2/6/3f2695d3/HB1008.02.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/e/8/b/ee8b296b/HB1008.02.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/3/a/6/e3a6f3b1/HB1008.02.COMH.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/4/4/7/0447c0d6/HB1008.03.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/6/4/7/e647cac6/HB1008.04.ENGS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/8/d/d/28dd9664/HB1008.04.ENGS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/1/8/5/b1859b1c/HB1008.04.ENGS.CON01.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/a/5/d/6a5d44ca/HB1008.05.ENRS.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/4/3/f/943f803d/HB1008.01.INTR.04.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/e/b/9/2eb94c40/HB1008.17_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/3/f/2/63f2ee4d/HB1008.18_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/c/2/f/fc2f7880/HB1008.33_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/9/9/6/d996c6c4/HB1008.02.COMH.03.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/c/6/e/bc6e98f9/HB1008.335_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/a/8/0/da808fde/HB1008.439_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback