IN HB1007 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - Public Law 110
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

State health improvement plan and grant program. Requires the state department of health (department), in consultation with the office of the secretary of family and social services, to study and prepare a plan (plan) to improve the health and behavioral health of Indiana residents based on specified criteria. Requires the department to submit and present the plan to the interim study committee on public health, behavioral health, and human services (interim study committee). Requires the department to prepare and present an annual report to the interim study committee regarding the progress made in meeting the metrics and goals of the plan. Requires that the department establish and maintain on the department's Internet web site a web page that indicates the performance and progress of the metrics and goals of the most significant areas identified in the plan. Establishes the prevention and addressing of health issues and challenges grant program (grant program). Establishes the prevention and addressing of health issues and challenges grant fund. Requires the department to administer the grant program. Provides requirements for grant proposals and specifies the types of proposals for which the grants must be awarded. Requires the management performance hub to develop and publish on an Internet web site a web page that tracks Indiana's metrics on the most significant areas of health and behavioral health impacting Indiana residents and demonstrate any progress made in these metrics. Provides that the web page must include specific progress reported by organizations awarded a grant under the grant program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State health improvement plan and grant program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-15 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 86 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House - Amendment #1 (DeLaney) failed (Y: 28 N: 62 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2021-02-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-23HousePublic Law 110
2021-04-23HouseSigned by the Governor
2021-04-22SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-04-20SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-04-19HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-04-15HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 450: yeas 86, nays 2
2021-04-14HouseMotion to concur filed
2021-04-14SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2021-04-13SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 410: yeas 46, nays 2
2021-04-12SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2021-04-08SenateAmendment #3 (Charbonneau) prevailed; voice vote
2021-04-08SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2021-03-25SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-03-18SenateSenator Yoder added as cosponsor
2021-03-18SenateCommittee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
2021-03-11SenateSenator Ford J.D. added as cosponsor
2021-03-02SenateSenator Qaddoura added as third sponsor
2021-02-23SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2021-02-17HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-02-16HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Charbonneau and Donato
2021-02-16HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 135: yeas 95, nays 2
2021-02-15HouseAmendment #1 (DeLaney) failed; Roll Call 120: yeas 28, nays 62
2021-02-15HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-02-11HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-02-01HouseReferred to the Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
2021-02-01HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2021-01-14HouseCoauthored by Representatives Barrett, Schaibley, Shackleford
2021-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Vermilion

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1007/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/e/a/5/bea59d3a/HB1007.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/1/f/6/51f6bc6d/HB1007.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/e/9/7/0e9765df/HB1007.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/1/7/c/d17c6eb3/HB1007.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/6/8/2/e6828b88/HB1007.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/a/c/d/1acdc905/HB1007.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/6/f/3/16f3559c/HB1007.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/c/0/7/ac07bcb3/HB1007.05.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/b/a/2/fba2ace8/HB1007.05.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/5/0/e/950e4282/HB1007.06.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/c/9/1/dc910d46/HB1007.06.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/f/9/8/af985712/HB1007.07.ENRS.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/3/0/c/930c828e/HB1007.03.COMH.AMH001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/d/b/7/8db742da/HB1007.05.COMS.AMS001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/5/9/4/f594c464/HB1007.05.COMS.AMS002.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/b/c/1/2bc13468/HB1007.05.COMS.AMS003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/6/3/3/b6336de2/HB1007.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/6/b/4/d6b48b59/HB1007.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/5/e/d/15edb924/HB1007.02.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/a/2/7/9a27c9b1/HB1007.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/4/3/0/04308a77/HB1007.02.COMH.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/3/e/7/c3e7649f/HB1007.03.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/7/2/b/372bf884/HB1007.03.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/9/a/7/39a75163/HB1007.03.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/1/e/e/e1eef3b1/HB1007.03.COMH.FN004.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/2/7/7/82777056/HB1007.03.COMH.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/d/b/0/1db0a752/HB1007.04.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/2/d/7/f2d74669/HB1007.04.COMS.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/e/3/4/1e345bb3/HB1007.05.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/3/3/b/d33bc400/HB1007.06.ENGS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/d/9/b/5d9bbf6c/HB1007.06.ENGS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/1/d/2/81d22cd4/HB1007.06.ENGS.CON01.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/8/2/0/5820b519/HB1007.07.ENRS.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/8/d/6/d8d6a059/HB1007.01.INTR.04.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/4/f/e/04fe2202/HB1007.02.COMH.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/3/6/9/2369ffd5/HB1007.120_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/3/2/5/13250c06/HB1007.135_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/0/2/0/d020e897/HB1007.03.COMH.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/8/7/9/48795180/HB1007.04.COMS.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/6/f/a/36fa80ac/HB1007.410_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/f/7/4/6f74a26d/HB1007.450_H.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback