IN HB1007 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 1
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Fiscal matters. Adds several standard provisions to the sports wagering fund. Repeals a provision requiring review by the budget committee of certain agreements or extensions of agreements entered into by the Indiana finance authority or the state. Appropriates money from the state general fund for various projects of Indiana's state educational institutions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fiscal matters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #1 (Tallian) failed (Y: 10 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #2 (Breaux) failed (Y: 10 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #3 (Tallian) failed (Y: 10 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 77 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - House - House - Amendment #7 (DeLaney) failed (Y: 30 N: 58 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2020-01-09 - House - House - Amendment #6 (DeLaney) failed (Y: 30 N: 58 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2020-01-09 - House - House - Amendment #3 (Porter) failed (Y: 29 N: 60 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2020-01-09 - House - House - Amendment #14 (Porter) failed (Y: 30 N: 58 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2020-01-09 - House - House - Amendment #16 (Campbell) failed (Y: 28 N: 60 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2020-01-09 - House - House - Amendment #11 (Porter) failed (Y: 30 N: 60 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2020-01-09 - House - House - Amendment #12 (Porter) failed (Y: 29 N: 61 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2020-01-07 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30HousePublic Law 1
2020-01-29HouseSigned by the Governor
2020-01-27SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-01-27SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2020-01-24HouseSigned by the Speaker
2020-01-23SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2020-01-23SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 48: yeas 38, nays 8
2020-01-21SenateSenator Holdman added as second sponsor
2020-01-21SenateAmendment #1 (Tallian) failed; Roll Call 36: yeas 10, nays 40
2020-01-21SenateAmendment #2 (Breaux) failed; Roll Call 35: yeas 10, nays 40
2020-01-21SenateAmendment #3 (Tallian) failed; Roll Call 34: yeas 10, nays 40
2020-01-21SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-16SenateSenator Charbonneau added as third sponsor
2020-01-16SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2020-01-14SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-13HouseReferred to the Senate
2020-01-13HouseRepresentatives Huston and Cherry added as coauthors
2020-01-13HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Mishler
2020-01-13HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 18: yeas 76, nays 22
2020-01-09HouseAmendment #7 (DeLaney) failed; Roll Call 14: yeas 30, nays 58
2020-01-09HouseAmendment #6 (DeLaney) failed; Roll Call 13: yeas 30, nays 58
2020-01-09HouseAmendment #3 (Porter) failed; Roll Call 12: yeas 29, nays 60
2020-01-09HouseAmendment #14 (Porter) failed; Roll Call 11: yeas 30, nays 58
2020-01-09HouseAmendment #16 (Campbell) failed; Roll Call 10: yeas 28, nays 60
2020-01-09HouseAmendment #1 (DeLaney) motion withdrawn
2020-01-09HouseAmendment #11 (Porter) failed; Roll Call 9: yeas 30, nays 60
2020-01-09HouseAmendment #12 (Porter) failed; Roll Call 8: yeas 29, nays 61
2020-01-09HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-07HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2020-01-06HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2020-01-06HouseAuthored by Representative Brown T

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/house/1007/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/0/1/a/e01a77d7/HB1007.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/e/b/0/aeb059a3/HB1007.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/1/2/9/f1291c7e/HB1007.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/6/7/a/867a8390/HB1007.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/d/d/d/9ddd462f/HB1007.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/3/6/2/13622581/HB1007.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/8/b/3/b8b3abc7/HB1007.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/3/3/8/a3383f2f/HB1007.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/c/9/1/5c91152e/HB1007.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/b/2/b/4b2bdc66/HB1007.8_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/3/4/9/63497d1c/HB1007.9_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/3/d/0/d3d03872/HB1007.10_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/0/3/b/803bac83/HB1007.11_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/9/2/0/8920487f/HB1007.12_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/3/4/9/9349e100/HB1007.13_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/3/4/c/234ce933/HB1007.14_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/4/c/f/d4cfdb2f/HB1007.18_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/5/a/b/75ab3f01/HB1007.03.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/e/b/e/3ebe4062/HB1007.01.INTR.03.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/5/a/0/a5a02052/HB1007.34_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/d/9/2/5d92ddc1/HB1007.35_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/1/9/d/e19d9561/HB1007.36_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/c/7/0/3c704ff6/HB1007.48_S.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback