IN HB1007 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Public Law 195
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Public Law 195
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Mental health access. Requires the office of Medicaid policy and planning to implement a centralized credentials verification organization and credentialing process. Allows the division of mental health and addiction (division) to grant approval for nine additional opioid treatment programs that: (1) are operated by a hospital; and (2) meet other specified requirements; if the division determines that there is a need for the program in the proposed location. Provides that mental health and addiction forensic treatment services may be administered or coordinated only by a provider certified by the division or licensed by the Indiana professional licensing agency to provide
Title
Mental health access. Requires the office of Medicaid policy and planning to implement a centralized credentials verification organization and credentialing process. Allows the division of mental health and addiction (division) to grant approval for nine additional opioid treatment programs that: (1) are operated by a hospital; and (2) meet other specified requirements; if the division determines that there is a need for the program in the proposed location. Provides that mental health and addiction forensic treatment services may be administered or coordinated only by a provider certified by the division or licensed by the Indiana professional licensing agency to provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | House | Public Law 195 |
2018-03-22 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2018-03-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2018-03-14 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 389: yeas 98, nays 0 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 400: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2018-03-14 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Charbonneau and Mrvan |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Head and Breaux |
2018-03-08 | House | House advisors appointed: Ziemke, Olthoff and Brown C |
2018-03-08 | House | House conferees appointed: Kirchhofer and Shackleford |
2018-03-08 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2018-03-08 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senator Zakas added as cosponsor |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 307: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Raatz) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Head) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as cosponsor |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-01 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2018-01-30 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Head and Charbonneau |
2018-01-30 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 74: yeas 97, nays 0 |
2018-01-29 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-01-25 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-22 | House | Representatives Ziemke, Davisson, Shackleford added as coauthors |
2018-01-08 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2018-01-08 | House | Authored by Representative Kirchhofer |