IN HB1007 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 52-3)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-01 - First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
Pending: Senate Health and Provider Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-01 - First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
Pending: Senate Health and Provider Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the office of the secretary of family and social services to develop and establish a pilot program in three counties to test for the use of controlled substances under certain conditions by an individual who: (1) receives assistance under the Temporary Assistance for Needy Families program for the individual or on behalf of a child; and (2) is at least 18 years of age. Requires the office of the secretary of family and social services to notify the department of child services (department) if a child is ineligible for assistance as a result of an individual testing positive for the illegal use of a controlled substance. Requires the department, not later than nine months after the date the department receives the report, to conduct a home visit at the child's residence to determine whether to pursue the report as a report of suspected child abuse or neglect. Requires the legislative council to establish and administer a program to test members of the general assembly for the use of controlled substances.
Title
Drug testing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-01-31 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 73 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - House - House - Amendment 5 (Riecken), prevailed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - House - House - Amendment 4 (Goodin), failed (Y: 39 N: 58 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-01-30 - House - House - Amendment 2 (C. Brown), failed (Y: 39 N: 58 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-01-30 - House - House - Amendment 6 (McMillin), prevailed (Y: 81 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - House - House - Amendment 3 (Dvorak), prevailed (Y: 55 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - House - House - Amendment 5 (Riecken), prevailed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - House - House - Amendment 4 (Goodin), failed (Y: 39 N: 58 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-01-30 - House - House - Amendment 2 (C. Brown), failed (Y: 39 N: 58 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-01-30 - House - House - Amendment 6 (McMillin), prevailed (Y: 81 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - House - House - Amendment 3 (Dvorak), prevailed (Y: 55 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-01 | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services | |
2012-01-31 | Senate sponsors: Senators Head and Banks | |
2012-01-31 | Referred to the Senate | |
2012-01-31 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 144: yeas 73, nays 23 | |
2012-01-30 | Amendment 5 (Riecken), prevailed; Roll Call 117: yeas 97, nays 0 | |
2012-01-30 | Amendment 4 (Goodin), failed; Roll Call 116: yeas 39, nays 58 | |
2012-01-30 | Amendment 1 (Goodin), failed; voice vote | |
2012-01-30 | Amendment 2 (C. Brown), failed; Roll Call 115: yeas 39, nays 58 | |
2012-01-30 | Amendment 6 (McMillin), prevailed; Roll Call 114: yeas 81, nays 15 | |
2012-01-30 | Reread second time: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-27 | Amendment 3 (Dvorak), prevailed; Roll Call 78: yeas 55, nays 40 | |
2012-01-27 | Second reading: amended, call withdrawn | |
2012-01-25 | Representatives Bacon, Baird, Behning, Borders, T. Brown, Burton, Cheatham, Clere, Crouch, Culver, Davisson, Dermody, Dodge, Eberhart, Ellspermann, Espich, Foley, Friend, Frizzell, R. Frye, Goodin, Gutwein, Heaton, Heuer, Hinkle, Kirchhofer, Knollman, Koch, Kubacki, Lehe, Lehman, Leonard, Lutz, Mahan, McNamara, Messmer, Morris, Neese, Rhoads, Richardson, Saunders, M. Smith, Speedy, Steuerwald, Thompson, Torr, Truitt, Turner, Wesco, Wolkins, Yarde and Ubelhor added as coauthors | |
2012-01-25 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-23 | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 | |
2012-01-23 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-12 | Representative Noe added as coauthor | |
2012-01-09 | First reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs | |
2012-01-09 | Coauthored by Representative VanNatter | |
2012-01-09 | Authored by Representative McMillin |