IN HB1006 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the secretary of state, in collaboration with other state agencies, to develop and maintain a web site that would allow a person to submit information concerning the person's business to the secretary of state and other state agencies, as applicable, for the purpose of complying with the requirements of state law, including establishing the new business, registering with states agencies, and obtaining necessary licenses and permits. Allows money in the electronic and enhanced access fund to be used to develop and maintain the Internet web site. Requires the Indiana economic development corporation (IEDC) to work with local economic development organizations within geographic regions in Indiana and with the various state economic development organizations within the states contiguous to Indiana. Requires the IEDC to include, in its annual report to the general assembly, recommendations for strategies and plans for collaboration with local economic development organizations and with the various state economic development organizations of neighboring states. Requires the department of education, in cooperation with the commission for higher education and the IEDC, to develop curriculum guides based on best practices for entrepreneurship instruction in high schools. Requires the commission for higher education (commission) to make an inventory of entrepreneurship programs conducted by colleges and universities in Indiana and to display the inventory on the commission's web site for the use of students, after consulting with the department of workforce development and the Indiana economic development corporation.
Title
Entrepreneurial know-how.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-28 - House - House - House reconsidered and concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-16 | Effective 07/01/2011 | |
2011-05-16 | Public Law 114 | |
2011-05-09 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-04 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-04-29 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2011-04-29 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2011-04-28 | House reconsidered and concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 693: yeas 97, nays 0 | |
2011-04-25 | Senate advisor appointed: M. Young | |
2011-04-25 | Senate conferees appointed: Hershman and Arnold | |
2011-04-25 | House advisors appointed: Ellspermann, Torr and Battles | |
2011-04-25 | House conferees appointed: Crouch and Reske | |
2011-04-25 | House dissented from Senate amendments | |
2011-04-21 | Returned to the House with amendments | |
2011-04-21 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 431: yeas 50 and nays 0 | |
2011-04-19 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-04-12 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-02-17 | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce & Economic Development | |
2011-02-15 | Senate sponsors: Senators Hershman and Arnold | |
2011-02-15 | Referred to the Senate | |
2011-02-15 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 161: yeas 95, nays 0 | |
2011-02-14 | Amendment 1 (Battles), prevailed; voice vote | |
2011-02-14 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2011-02-10 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-18 | Representative Noe added as coauthor | |
2011-01-12 | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce, Small Business and Economic Development | |
2011-01-12 | Coauthored by Representatives Truitt and Reske | |
2011-01-12 | Authored by Representative Crouch |