IN HB1004 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 93
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Health matters. States that the office of the secretary of family and social services and a managed care organization may not prohibit a provider from participating in another insurance network. Defines "weighted average negotiated charge" and requires the weighted average negotiated charge per service per provider type for Medicaid to be reported by hospitals and ambulatory outpatient surgical centers. Requires certain health care providers, beginning July 1, 2021, to provide a good faith estimate to individuals of the price for nonemergency health care services to be provided to the individual by the health care provider and sets forth requirements. Allows an individual to request a good faith estimate from a health care provider for the total price for nonemergency services that have been ordered, scheduled, or referred. and requires the health care provider to provide the good faith estimate. Sets forth requirements for the good faith estimate. Provides that an out of network practitioner who provides health care services to a covered individual in an in network facility may not charge more for the health care services provided to a covered individual than allowed according to the rate or amount of compensation established by the covered individual's network plan unless: (1) at least five days before the health care services are scheduled to be provided, the covered individual is provided a statement that: (A) informs the covered individual that the facility or practitioner intends to charge more than allowed under the network plan; and (B) sets forth an estimate of the charge; and (2) the covered individual signs the statement, signifying the covered individual's consent to the charge. Sets forth notice requirements. Sets forth provisions that a physician noncompete agreement must include in order to be enforceable. Provides for information and notification that an employer must give to a physician who leaves the employment of the provider. Allows an individual to request from a health carrier a good faith estimate of the amount of the cost of nonemergency health care services that the health carrier will pay for or reimburse and the applicable benefit limitations of the nonemergency health care service. Sets forth requirements of a good faith estimate by a health carrier and sets penalties for violations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health matters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 59 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Shackleford) failed (Y: 31 N: 62 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2020-01-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30HousePublic Law 93
2020-03-18HouseSigned by the Governor
2020-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-16HouseSigned by the Speaker
2020-03-12SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2020-03-11SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 401: yeas 46, nays 2
2020-03-11HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 397: yeas 59, nays 32
2020-03-11SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2020-03-11HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2020-03-11HouseRepresentative Schaibley added as conferee
2020-03-11HouseRepresentative Austin removed as conferee
2020-03-11HouseRepresentative Schaibley removed as advisor
2020-03-05SenateSenator Ford Jon added as advisor
2020-03-05SenateSenate advisors appointed: Brown L and Melton
2020-03-05SenateSenate conferees appointed: Charbonneau and Breaux
2020-03-05HouseRepresentative Fleming added as advisor
2020-03-05HouseRepresentative Austin added as conferee
2020-03-05HouseRepresentative Fleming removed as conferee
2020-03-04HouseHouse advisors appointed: Carbaugh, Schaibley, Lehman, Judy, Shackleford, Bauer and Campbell
2020-03-04HouseHouse conferees appointed: Smaltz and Fleming
2020-03-04HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2020-03-04HouseMotion to dissent filed
2020-03-04SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2020-03-03SenateSenator Spartz added as cosponsor
2020-03-03SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 271: yeas 49, nays 1
2020-03-02SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2020-03-02SenateAmendment #5 (Charbonneau) prevailed; voice vote
2020-03-02SenateAmendment #4 (Charbonneau) prevailed; voice vote
2020-03-02SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2020-02-27SenateSenator Breaux added as cosponsor
2020-02-27SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-02-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2020-01-29HouseReferred to the Senate
2020-01-28HouseRepresentatives Lehman and Carbaugh added as coauthors
2020-01-28HouseRepresentative Barrett added as coauthor
2020-01-28HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Charbonneau and Bassler
2020-01-28HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 75: yeas 99, nays 0
2020-01-27HouseAmendment #3 (Austin) motion withdrawn
2020-01-27HouseAmendment #1 (Shackleford) failed; Roll Call 67: yeas 31, nays 62
2020-01-27HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-23HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-06HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Insurance
2020-01-06HouseAuthored by Representative Smaltz

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/house/1004/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/3/1/7/2317f763/HB1004.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/a/0/8/ca08932b/HB1004.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/3/e/3/b3e31e0f/HB1004.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/3/b/5/63b5fd65/HB1004.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/3/b/8/d3b8482f/HB1004.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/3/4/d/d34d90cd/HB1004.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/5/c/c/75cc38bc/HB1004.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/b/2/d/7b2d22db/HB1004.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/8/6/1/5861a895/HB1004.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/a/c/d/eacd3464/HB1004.01.INTR.03.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/8/8/e/a88e5f79/HB1004.67_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/f/5/9/5f592fae/HB1004.75_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/9/d/0/99d00543/HB1004.02.COMH.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/c/a/6/bca630d8/HB1004.271_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/8/8/8/28887e13/HB1004.401_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/a/8/5/7a85ec81/HB1004.397_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback