IN HB1004 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Public Law 184
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Public Law 184
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prekindergarten education. Provides that, after June 30, 2017, the early education grant pilot program (prekindergarten pilot program) includes: (1) eligible providers in an additional 15 counties; and (2) eligible providers that received a grant under the early education matching grant program and meet certain conditions. Changes references to the "pilot program" to the "prekindergarten pilot program". Adds additional requirements for an eligible provider to participate in the prekindergarten pilot program. Adds additional requirements for an eligible child to qualify for or receive a grant under the prekindergarten pilot program. Amends income eligibility requirements for eligible children in counties that meet
Title
Prekindergarten education. Provides that, after June 30, 2017, the early education grant pilot program (prekindergarten pilot program) includes: (1) eligible providers in an additional 15 counties; and (2) eligible providers that received a grant under the early education matching grant program and meet certain conditions. Changes references to the "pilot program" to the "prekindergarten pilot program". Adds additional requirements for an eligible provider to participate in the prekindergarten pilot program. Adds additional requirements for an eligible child to qualify for or receive a grant under the prekindergarten pilot program. Amends income eligibility requirements for eligible children in counties that meet
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Behning [R] | Rep. Holli Sullivan [R] | Rep. Justin Moed [D] | Sen. Jeff Raatz [R] |
Sen. Travis Holdman [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Sen. Eddie Melton [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-21 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 82 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 61 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House - Amendment #3 (DeLaney) failed (Y: 28 N: 63 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2017-02-06 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Smith V) failed (Y: 36 N: 57 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-01-31 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 61 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House - Amendment #3 (DeLaney) failed (Y: 28 N: 63 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2017-02-06 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Smith V) failed (Y: 36 N: 57 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-01-31 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | House | Public Law 184 |
2017-04-26 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-04-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-04-21 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 515: yeas 82, nays 16 |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 504: yeas 31, nays 19 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2017-04-20 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Senator Raatz added as conferee |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Senator Raatz removed as advisor |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Senator Melton removed as conferee |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Senator Leising added as advisor |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Raatz, Mrvan, Kruse and Kenley |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Holdman and Melton |
2017-04-10 | House | House advisors appointed: Sullivan, DeVon and DeLaney |
2017-04-10 | House | House conferees appointed: Behning and Smith V |
2017-04-06 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2017-04-06 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 323: yeas 38, nays 11 |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Leising) prevailed; voice vote |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senator Melton added as cosponsor |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senator Holdman added as second sponsor |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as third sponsor |
2017-02-20 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2017-02-07 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Raatz |
2017-02-07 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 82: yeas 61, nays 34 |
2017-02-06 | House | Amendment #3 (DeLaney) failed; Roll Call 63: yeas 28, nays 63 |
2017-02-06 | House | Amendment #1 (Smith V) failed; Roll Call 62: yeas 36, nays 57 |
2017-02-06 | House | Amendment #6 (Behning) prevailed; voice vote |
2017-02-06 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2017-02-02 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-01-12 | House | Representative Moed added as coauthor |
2017-01-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2017-01-10 | House | Coauthored by Representative Sullivan |
2017-01-10 | House | Authored by Representative Behning |