IN HB1003 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 211
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Nonpublic school scholarships.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nonpublic school scholarships.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-26 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 27 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 27 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 4 (Lanane), rejected (Y: 13 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 14 (Stoops), rejected (Y: 13 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 5 (Lanane), rejected (Y: 14 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 11 (Broden), rejected (Y: 13 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 3 (Lanane), rejected (Y: 14 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 10 (Broden), rejected (Y: 17 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 1 (Skinner), rejected (Y: 15 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-21 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 57 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-13HousePublic Law 211
2013-05-09HouseSigned by the Governor
2013-05-03HouseSigned by the Speaker
2013-05-01SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2013-04-30SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2013-04-26SenateConference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 586: yeas 27, nays 23
2013-04-26SenateRules suspended
2013-04-26HouseConference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 652: yeas 55, nays 44
2013-04-26HouseRules suspended
2013-04-26HouseRepresentative Huston added as conferee
2013-04-26HouseRepresentative Huston removed as House advisor
2013-04-26HouseRepresentative V. Smith removed as conferee
2013-04-25SenateSenator Yoder added as conferee
2013-04-25SenateSenator Yoder removed as advisor
2013-04-25SenateSenator R. Young removed as conferee
2013-04-16SenateSenate advisors appointed: Yoder, Rogers, Skinner and Leising
2013-04-16SenateSenate conferee appointed: Eckerty and R. Young
2013-04-15HouseHouse advisors appointed: Bosma, Huston, Battles, VanDenburgh and Errington
2013-04-15HouseHouse conferees appointed: Behning and V. Smith
2013-04-11HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2013-04-10SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2013-04-10SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 413: yeas 27 and nays 23
2013-04-09SenateAmendment 4 (Lanane), rejected; Roll Call 408: yeas 13, nays 37
2013-04-09SenateAmendment 14 (Stoops), rejected; Roll Call 407: yeas 13, nays 37
2013-04-09SenateAmendment 5 (Lanane), rejected; Roll Call 406: yeas 14, nays 36
2013-04-09SenateAmendment 11 (Broden), rejected; Roll Call 405: yeas 13, nays 37
2013-04-09SenateAmendment 3 (Lanane), rejected; Roll Call 404: yeas 14, nays 36
2013-04-09SenateAmendment 10 (Broden), rejected; Roll Call 403: yeas 17, nays 33
2013-04-09SenateAmendment 1 (Skinner), rejected; Roll Call 402: yeas 15, nays 34
2013-04-09SenateAmendment 2 (Eckerty), prevailed; voice vote
2013-04-09SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2013-04-02SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-03-28SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, reassigned to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
2013-03-14SenateSenators Kruse and Leising added as cosponsors
2013-02-27SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2013-02-25HouseRepresentative DeVon added as coauthor
2013-02-21HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Eckerty and Yoder
2013-02-21HouseReferred to the Senate
2013-02-21HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 211: yeas 57, nays 36
2013-02-20HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-02-18HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-02-11HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
2013-02-11HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-01-15HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2013-01-15HouseCoauthored by Representative Huston
2013-01-15HouseAuthored by Representative Behning

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.in.gov/apps/lsa/session/billwatch/billinfo?year=2013&session=1&request=getBill&doctype=HB&docno=1003
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/IN/IN1003.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/HB/HB1003.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/HB/HB1003.2.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/EH/EH1003.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/EH/EH1003.2.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/EH/EH1003.3.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/HE/HE1003.1.html
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Hrollcal/0211.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Srollcal/0402.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Srollcal/0403.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Srollcal/0404.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Srollcal/0405.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Srollcal/0406.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Srollcal/0407.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Srollcal/0408.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Srollcal/0413.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Srollcal/0586.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Hrollcal/0652.PDF.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback