IN HB1002 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 150
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 150
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Teacher evaluations. Removes the requirement that a school corporation's annual performance evaluation plan must be based, in part, on objective measures of student achievement. Authorizes the state board of education to adopt emergency rules. Makes conforming amendments. Makes technical corrections.
Title
Teacher evaluations.
Sponsors
Rep. Anthony Cook [R] | Rep. Wendy McNamara [R] | Rep. Steve Bartels [R] | Rep. Vernon Smith [D] |
Sen. Jeff Raatz [R] | Sen. Brian Buchanan [R] | Sen. Mark Stoops [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Sen. James Buck [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - House - House - Amendment #2 (Smith V) failed (Y: 30 N: 61 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2020-01-07 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - House - House - Amendment #2 (Smith V) failed (Y: 30 N: 61 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2020-01-07 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-30 | House | Public Law 150 |
2020-03-21 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2020-03-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senator Buck added as cosponsor |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 269: yeas 49, nays 1 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senator Buchanan added as second sponsor |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as cosponsor |
2020-02-05 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2020-01-14 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2020-01-13 | House | Representative Smith, V. added as coauthor |
2020-01-13 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Raatz |
2020-01-13 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 17: yeas 100, nays 0 |
2020-01-09 | House | Amendment #2 (Smith V) failed; Roll Call 7: yeas 30, nays 61 |
2020-01-09 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-08 | House | Representative Bartels added as coauthor |
2020-01-07 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-01-06 | House | Representative McNamara added as coauthor |
2020-01-06 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2020-01-06 | House | Authored by Representative Cook |