IN HB1002 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 150
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Teacher evaluations. Removes the requirement that a school corporation's annual performance evaluation plan must be based, in part, on objective measures of student achievement. Authorizes the state board of education to adopt emergency rules. Makes conforming amendments. Makes technical corrections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Teacher evaluations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - House - House - Amendment #2 (Smith V) failed (Y: 30 N: 61 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2020-01-07 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30HousePublic Law 150
2020-03-21HouseSigned by the Governor
2020-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-09SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2020-03-04HouseSigned by the Speaker
2020-03-04SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2020-03-03SenateSenator Buck added as cosponsor
2020-03-03SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 269: yeas 49, nays 1
2020-03-02SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2020-03-02SenateSenator Buchanan added as second sponsor
2020-03-02SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-02-27SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2020-02-20SenateSenator Stoops added as cosponsor
2020-02-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2020-01-14HouseReferred to the Senate
2020-01-13HouseRepresentative Smith, V. added as coauthor
2020-01-13HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Raatz
2020-01-13HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 17: yeas 100, nays 0
2020-01-09HouseAmendment #2 (Smith V) failed; Roll Call 7: yeas 30, nays 61
2020-01-09HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-08HouseRepresentative Bartels added as coauthor
2020-01-07HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2020-01-06HouseRepresentative McNamara added as coauthor
2020-01-06HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2020-01-06HouseAuthored by Representative Cook

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/house/1002/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/4/d/a/24da4f29/HB1002.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/f/c/4/bfc450c6/HB1002.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/f/4/1/df418cc1/HB1002.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/a/7/9/7a794fc8/HB1002.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/3/0/3/2303348e/HB1002.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/0/4/e/304edbb2/HB1002.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/2/6/3/f263a410/HB1002.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/8/c/1/d8c14fbd/HB1002.01.INTR.03.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/b/9/9/cb99cee0/HB1002.7_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/1/5/0/2150336b/HB1002.17_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/9/e/8/69e82b1e/HB1002.02.COMH.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/f/f/b/1ffbd3db/HB1002.269_S.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback