IN HB1002 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes the budget agency to transfer not more than $200,000,000 from the state general fund to the major moves 2020 trust fund (trust fund). (Current law requires a transfer of $200,000,000.) Provides that the transfer is in addition to a transfer from the state general fund to the trust fund made before January 1, 2014. Authorizes the budget agency, after review by the budget committee, to transfer before July 1, 2014, not more than $200,000,000 from the trust fund to the major moves construction fund (construction fund). Provides that if a transfer is made to the trust fund from the state general fund after December 31, 2013, and subject to budget committee review, the budget agency may transfer from the trust fund to the construction fund an additional amount equal to the lesser of $200,000,000 or the total amount of transfers made to the trust fund after December 31, 2013.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation funding.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 95 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 11 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations - Roll Call 100203 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House Floor - (Y: 27 N: 64 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2014-01-23 - House - House Floor - (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Roll Call 100201 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-27HouseSigned by the Governor
2014-03-27HousePublic Law 201
2014-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2014-03-13HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 492: yeas 95 and nays 4
2014-03-13SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2014-03-13SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 433: yeas 43 and nays 5
2014-03-13HouseSigned by the Speaker
2014-03-12SenateSenator Hershman added as conferee
2014-03-12SenateSenator Hershman removed as advisor
2014-03-12SenateSenator Skinner removed as conferee
2014-03-04SenateSenator Yoder added as advisor
2014-03-04SenateSenator Wyss added as advisor
2014-03-04SenateSenator Tallian added as advisor
2014-03-04SenateSenator Hershman added as advisor
2014-03-04SenateSenator Skinner added as conferee
2014-03-04SenateSenator Kenley added as conferee
2014-03-04HouseRepresentative Klinker added as advisor
2014-03-04HouseRepresentative Pryor added as advisor
2014-03-04HouseRepresentative Turner added as advisor
2014-03-04HouseRepresentative Cherry added as advisor
2014-03-04HouseRepresentative Porter added as conferee
2014-03-04HouseRepresentative Soliday added as conferee
2014-03-04HouseHouse dissented from Senate Amendments
2014-02-27SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2014-02-27SenateThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 250: yeas 49 and nays 0
2014-02-27SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor.
2014-02-25SenateSecond reading: engrossed.
2014-02-25SenateHB 1002 Amendment #1 (Lanane), failed.
2014-02-20SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted.
2014-02-10SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Appropriations
2014-02-03HouseRepresentative Klinker added as coauthor.
2014-02-03HouseSenator Kenley added as sponsor.
2014-02-03HouseReferred to the Senate
2014-02-03HouseThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 164: yeas 91 and nays 2
2014-02-03HouseRepresentative Porter added as coauthor.
2014-01-30HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2014-01-30HouseHB 1002 Amendment #2 (Porter), failed.
2014-01-30HouseHB 1002 Amendment #1 (Soliday), prevailed.
2014-01-27HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted.
2014-01-23HouseRepresentative Cherry added as coauthor.
2014-01-23HouseRepresentative Thompson added as coauthor.
2014-01-13HouseCoauthored by Representative Soliday
2014-01-13HouseFirst Reading: Referred to Ways and Means
2014-01-13HouseAuthored by Representative T. Brown.

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2014/bills/house/1002/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/5/2/3/c52360ee/HB1002.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/a/8/d/5a8daf76/HB1002.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/3/8/e/f38e589d/HB1002.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/1/e/b/71ebad4e/HB1002.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/3/f/4/13f4710c/HB1002.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/7/4/c/d74c5640/HB1132.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/6/7/5/c675bed1/HB1132.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/2/b/8/12b8597a/HB1002.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/a/b/b/eabbf634/HB1002.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/5/0/1/95011d06/HB1002.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/f/a/e/6fae827a/HB1002.05.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/6/2/6/9626ed9d/HB1002.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/c/f/c/4cfc354a/HB1002.02.COMH.128.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/7/8/d/f78dcc51/HB1002.03.ENGH.164.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/5/a/9/45a90d2b/HB1132.02.COMH.46.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/b/7/c/2b7c14a9/HB1002.03.ENGH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/0/6/e/906efffa/HB1002.04.COMS.232.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/8/1/b/f81b1e0f/HB1002.04.COMS.250.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/1/e/8/51e8550f/HB1002.04.COMS.492.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/1/e/e/51ee5181/HB1002.04.COMS.433.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback