IN HB1002 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on February 29 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Reenacts the public officers compensation advisory commission that was repealed in 2011. Establishes the environmental rules board. Decreases the membership of the Indiana war memorials commission from ten to nine members with one member from each congressional district. Consolidates duplicative reporting required for the Indiana economic development corporation (IEDC). Consolidates reporting requirements imposed on the IEDC for various programs administered by the IEDC into the state economic incentives and compliance report. Repeals the chapter requiring the IEDC to study the steel industry and provide expertise to public officials regarding the steel industry. Repeals and otherwise eliminates reporting requirements imposed on the IEDC to consolidate those requirements at another location in the Indiana Code. Repeals the commission on the social status of black males and the Native American Indian affairs commission and re-enacts them in the article of the Indiana Code dealing with commissions. Transfers staffing responsibility for the commission on the social status of black males from the division of family resources, family and social services, to the civil rights commission. Transfers staffing responsibility for the Native American Indian affairs commission, the Indiana commission for women, and the commission on Hispanic/Latino affairs from the department of workforce development to the civil rights commission. Makes conforming technical changes. Provides that a capital investment tax credit may not be granted after December 31, 2016. Repeals the law that establishes the tobacco farmers and rural community impact fund. Repeals the law that allows certain political subdivisions to borrow money for rural community water supply systems. Removes obsolete references to the abandoned railroad corridors board. Reduces the membership of the natural resources advisory council from eleven to seven members; provides for the council to meet in January and on the call of the chairperson; and makes conforming changes. Broadens the requirements for the appointment of one member of the board of animal health. Repeals the following committees, commissions, and boards: (1) Office of community and rural affairs advisory council. (2) Tobacco farmers and rural community impact fund. (3) Air pollution control board. (4) Water pollution control board. (5) Solid waste management board. (6) Indiana arts commission trust fund board. (7) Council on library automation. (8) Library advisory council. (9) Law enforcement, school policing, and youth work group. (10) Affordable housing and community development fund advisory committee. (11) Indiana health informatics corporation. (12) Ohio River bridges project commission. (13) Veterans' home advisory committee. (14) Mental health corrections quality advisory committee. (15) Department of local government finance rule adoption committee. (16) Courthouse preservation advisory commission. (17) Rural community water supply loan program. (18) Water shortage task force. (19) Water resources task force. (20) Corporation for educational technology. (21) Educational technology council. (22) School air quality panel. (23) Building and trades advisory committee. Makes conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elimination of commissions, boards, and committees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-09 - House - House - House reconsidered and concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 61 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-19 Signed by the Governor
2012-03-14 Signed by the President of the Senate
2012-03-13 Signed by the Speaker
2012-03-13 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2012-03-09 Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the House
2012-03-09 Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the Senate
2012-03-09 House reconsidered and concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 394: yeas 61, nays 36
2012-03-05 Senate advisors appointed: Landske, Taylor and Gard
2012-03-05 Senate conferee appointed: Lawson and Tallian
2012-03-01 House advisors appointed: Koch, Noe and Dobis
2012-03-01 House conferees appointed: Wolkins and Pierce
2012-03-01 House dissented from Senate amendments
2012-02-29 Returned to the House with amendments
2012-02-29 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 266: yeas 44 and nays 4
2012-02-28 Amendment 4 (Gard), prevailed; voice vote
2012-02-28 Amendment 5 (Lawson), prevailed; voice vote
2012-02-28 Amendment 2 (Lawson), prevailed; voice vote
2012-02-28 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2012-02-20 Senator Taylor added as cosponsor
2012-02-16 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2012-02-01 First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
2012-01-30 Senate sponsors: Senators Lawson and Landske
2012-01-30 Referred to the Senate
2012-01-30 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 123: yeas 97, nays 0
2012-01-27 Amendment 30 (V. Smith), withdrawn
2012-01-27 Amendment 1 (Wolkins), prevailed; voice vote
2012-01-27 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2012-01-23 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2012-01-17 Representative Koch added as coauthor
2012-01-09 First reading: referred to Committee on Select Committee on Government Reduction
2012-01-09 Coauthored by Representative Dobis
2012-01-09 Authored by Representative Wolkins

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback